UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $62,500.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $62,500.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Case Number: 1:2018cv02504
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Eric P. Babbs' appearance shall be entered as counsel of record for the United States; Attorney Debra G. Richards is withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/26/2018. (TMB)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Substitute Attorney , filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babbs, Eric)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property - The United States is ordered to take custody of and to deliver the defendant currency into the possession of the United States of America, to be detained in the possession of the United States until further order of this Court, and you will make return thereon not later than ten (10) days after execution of process. Signed by Clerk on 8/16/2018. Paper copies to USM.(APD)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra G. Richards on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Richards, Debra)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT OF FORFEITURE IN REM against $62,500.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property)(Richards, Debra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $62,500.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $62,500.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Debra G. Richards
Represented By: Eric Parker Babbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?