SHAFFER et al v. NATIONAL EXPRESS CARRIERS, INC. et al

Plaintiff: ANGELA SHAFFER and LONNIE BLAND
Defendant: RUSSELL ALLEN and NATIONAL EXPRESS CARRIERS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02550
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: William T Lawrence
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Resetting Status Conference: The court, on its own motion, VACATES the December 18, 2018, telephone status conference and RESETS it for December 19, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call- in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/26/2018.(SWM)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/26/2018.(SWM)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on September 19, 2018, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. This case is set for a telephone status conference on December 18, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Discovery due by 12/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/20/2018.(CBU)
September 12, 2018 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants RUSSELL ALLEN, NATIONAL EXPRESS CARRIERS, INC. . (David, Lynsey)
August 30, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses, filed by RUSSELL ALLEN, NATIONAL EXPRESS CARRIERS, INC..(David, Lynsey)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 Statement Responding to Allegations of Notice of Removal by All Plaintiffs. (Foushee, Nathan)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2018 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/21/2018.(SWM)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 Submission of Signature Requirement re #3 Notice of Appearance by All Defendants. (David, Lynsey)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL EXPRESS CARRIERS, INC.. (Foos, Robert)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendants RUSSELL ALLEN, NATIONAL EXPRESS CARRIERS, INC.. (Foos, Robert)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynsey F. David on behalf of Defendants RUSSELL ALLEN, NATIONAL EXPRESS CARRIERS, INC.. (David, Lynsey)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R. Foos on behalf of Defendants RUSSELL ALLEN, NATIONAL EXPRESS CARRIERS, INC.. (Foos, Robert)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court 4, case number 49D04-1805-CT-020860, filed by All Defendants. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number 0756-5023349) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record (Complaint, MET, Jury Demand, Appearance, Order, Motion, Order))(Foos, Robert) Modified on 8/17/2018 (HET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAFFER et al v. NATIONAL EXPRESS CARRIERS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA SHAFFER
Represented By: Nathan D. Foushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONNIE BLAND
Represented By: Nathan D. Foushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSSELL ALLEN
Represented By: Robert R. Foos
Represented By: Lynsey F. David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL EXPRESS CARRIERS, INC.
Represented By: Robert R. Foos
Represented By: Lynsey F. David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?