VORHEES v. MOORE et al

Plaintiff: WANDA VORHEES
Defendant: ANTHONY MOORE and U.S. XPRESS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02722
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
2 Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2018 at 10:00 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/19/2018.(CBU)
October 4, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by U.S. XPRESS, INC..(Pfleging, Lesley)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Defendant U.S. Xpress, Inc.'s #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to the Complaint to 10/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/2/2018. (MAC)
September 28, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to October 12, 2018 to file Responsive Pleading, filed by Defendant U.S. XPRESS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfleging, Lesley)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 Reassignment of Case to Judge James R. Sweeney II. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number ( 1:18-cv-2722-JRS-DLP), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (CJD)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 Statement Responding to Allegations of Notice of Removal by All Plaintiffs. (Foushee, Nathan)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan D. Foushee on behalf of Plaintiff WANDA VORHEES. (Foushee, Nathan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (APD)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant U.S. XPRESS, INC.. (Strawbridge, Katherine)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. XPRESS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent U.S. XPRESS ENTERPRISES, INC. for U.S. XPRESS, INC... (Strawbridge, Katherine)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant U.S. XPRESS, INC.. (Strawbridge, Katherine)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley A. Pfleging on behalf of Defendant U.S. XPRESS, INC.. (Pfleging, Lesley)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine S. Strawbridge on behalf of Defendant U.S. XPRESS, INC.. (Strawbridge, Katherine)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton Circuit Court, case number 29C01-1808-CT-007184, filed by U.S. XPRESS, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5044072) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record (Summons, Complaint, Appearance, Jury Demand, MET, Order, Appearance))(Strawbridge, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VORHEES v. MOORE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANDA VORHEES
Represented By: Nathan D. Foushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. XPRESS, INC.
Represented By: Katherine S. Strawbridge
Represented By: Lesley A. Pfleging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?