SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. STEELE et al
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant: STEELE FINANCIAL, INC. and TAMARA STEELE
Case Number: 1:2018cv02838
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. Lombardi on behalf of Plaintiff SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Lombardi, Kevin)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TAMARA STEELE, STEELE FINANCIAL, INC.. (Pence, Linda)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to STEELE FINANCIAL, INC.. (LAB) (CKM)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT TO WAIVE SERVICE OF SUMMONS by All Defendants. (Pence, Linda)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda L. Pence on behalf of Defendants TAMARA STEELE, STEELE FINANCIAL, INC.. (Pence, Linda)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TAMARA STEELE and STEELE FINANCIAL, INC. (DJH)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Robert Bockin on behalf of Plaintiff SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Bockin, Gregory)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Bockin, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. STEELE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEELE FINANCIAL, INC.
Represented By: Linda L. Pence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAMARA STEELE
Represented By: Linda L. Pence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: Gregory Robert Bockin
Represented By: Kevin C. Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?