SMITH v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION et al

Plaintiff: LOWELL B. SMITH
Defendant: PLAINFIELD CORRECTIONAL MEDICAL DEPARTMENT, CORIZION MEDICAL COMPANY, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION, PLAINFIELD CORRECTIONAL FACIILITY and STANLEY KNIGHT
Case Number: 1:2018cv02938
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
0 Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
1 Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
2 Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2018 18 Mail Returned as undeliverable - RTS/No Such Number/Unable to Forward. #13 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct sent to LOWELL B. SMITH - 251281, PLAINFIELD CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 727 MOON ROAD, PLAINFIELD, IN 46168 . (DWH) Modified on 11/15/2018 (DWH).
November 13, 2018 17 Reassignment of Case to Judge James Patrick Hanlon. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number ( 1:18-cv-2938-JPH-DLP), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (JDad)
October 26, 2018 16 RESPONSE, re #6 Entry Screening Complaint, filed by Plaintiff LOWELL B. SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(APD)
October 26, 2018 15 Second Submission of Additional Claims, filed by Plaintiff LOWELL B. SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(APD)
October 26, 2018 14 Submission of Additional Claims, filed by Plaintiff LOWELL B. SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(APD)
October 24, 2018 13 Entry Denying Motion to Amend - For the reasons stated in this Entry, the plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint by substituting Wexford Medical Services for Corizon Medical Company, dkt #9 , is denied. (See Entry). Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/24/2018. (APD)
October 23, 2018 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by STANLEY KNIGHT. STANLEY KNIGHT waiver sent on 10/15/2018. (Scheil, Andrew)
October 23, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Marley Genele Hancock on behalf of Defendant STANLEY KNIGHT. (Hancock, Marley)
October 23, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Scheil on behalf of Defendant STANLEY KNIGHT. (Scheil, Andrew)
October 15, 2018 9 MOTION to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiff LOWELL B. SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(APD)
October 15, 2018 8 Documents for Service by IDOC - re #7 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk, #6 EntryAdd and Terminate Parties, #1 Complaint. (APD)
October 15, 2018 7 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk (APD)
October 15, 2018 6 Entry Screening Complaint and Directing Further Proceedings - The plaintiff is a prisoner currently incarcerated at Plainfield Correctional Facility. Because the plaintiff is a "prisoner" as defined by 28 U.S.C. 1915(h), this Court has an obligation under 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b) to screen his complaint before service on the defendants. The claims against Indiana Department of Correction, Plainfield Correctional Facility, Plainfield Correctional Medical Department, Corizon Medical Company, and Warden Stanley Knight, in his individual capacity, are dismissed and the clerk is directed to terminate these defendants on the docket. The state law contract and tort claims are dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. The injunctive relief claim against Warden Stanley Knight, in his official capacity only, shall proceed in this action and the clerk is directed to update the docket accordingly. The clerk is further directed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) to issue process to defendant Warden Stanley Knight in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). The clerk is directed to serve the Indiana Department of Correction employee electronically. (See Entry). Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/15/2018.(APD)
October 2, 2018 5 Featured Case Order on In Forma Pauperis Status - Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The assessment of even an initial partial filing fee is waived because the plaintiff has no assets and no means by which to pay a partial filing fee. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(4). Accordingly, no initial partial filing fee is due at this time. Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/2/2018. (APD)
September 28, 2018 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by LOWELL B. SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(APD)
September 21, 2018 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
September 21, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff LOWELL B. SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)
September 21, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against CORIZION MEDICAL COMPANY, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION, STANLEY KNIGHT, PLAINFIELD CORRECTIONAL MEDICAL DEPARTMENT, PLAINFIELD CORRECTIONAL FACILITY filed by LOWELL B. SMITH. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO) Modified on 9/21/2018 (REO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOWELL B. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLAINFIELD CORRECTIONAL MEDICAL DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORIZION MEDICAL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLAINFIELD CORRECTIONAL FACIILITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANLEY KNIGHT
Represented By: Marley Genele Hancock
Represented By: Andrew Scheil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?