BECK v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Plaintiff: Mr. DONALD W. BECK and DONALD W. BECK
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2018cv03019
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2271
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Rota, Kelly)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Rota on behalf of Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Rota, Kelly)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE by DONALD W. BECK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit copies of certified mail receipts)(Pleasants, Larry) Modified on 11/14/2018 (CKM).
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to USA - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (HET)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry W. Pleasants on behalf of Plaintiff DONALD W. BECK. (Pleasants, Larry)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DONALD W. BECK, filed by DONALD W. BECK. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5088647) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons SD Attorney's Office, #2 Proposed Summons US Attorney General, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Cover sheet)(Pleasants, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BECK v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kelly Rota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. DONALD W. BECK
Represented By: Larry W. Pleasants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD W. BECK
Represented By: Larry W. Pleasants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?