EDWARDS et al v. HARRISON COLLEGE et al
Plaintiff: DARYANE SHADDAY, MELISSA SHAFFER, CHRISTOPH WEBER, MICHELLE DOTSON, STACY HAGER, NICOLLE SCHAFER, RAVEN STEINMETZ, DAYSHIA EDWARDS, MICHELLE BLATCHFORD, DEOMNI PAGE, PENELOPE LEWIS, HEATHER KELLEY, SARAH COVEY and KIMBRELY DURAND
Defendant: CRAIG PFANNENSTIEHL, HARRISON COLLEGE, EDUCATIONAL MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, MICHAEL CROWLEY, KENNETH KONESCO, JAMES HUTTON, GREGORY WALLIS and EDUCOR, INC.
Consolidated Plaintiff: ALLISON RANDLE, ASHLEY BRYANT, REBECCA NAUE, TIFFANIE GRIMM and ROBIN BOSTON
Case Number: 1:2018cv03170
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #19 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/30/2018. (JRB)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Consolidate Cases - Consequentially, the parties' Joint Motion to Consolidate (Filing No. 30) is GRANTED. Case Number 1:18-cv-03481-SEB-TAB shall be CONSOLIDATED into Case Number 1:18-cv-03170-RLY-DLP for all purposes. Case Number 1:18-cv-03481-SEB-TAB is to be ADMINISTRATIVELYCLOSED and all pending motions are to be DENIED AS MOOT. All future filings shall only be filed under 1:18-cv-03170-RLY-DLP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/30/2018. (JRB)
November 26, 2018 Filing 32 Submission of Parties' Agreed Scheduling Order, filed by Defendants EDUCATIONAL MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, EDUCOR, INC., HARRISON COLLEGE, JAMES HUTTON, KENNETH KONESCO, CRAIG PFANNENSTIEHL, GREGORY WALLIS. (Lindemann, Jessica)
November 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2019 at 10:30 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/25/2018.(CBU) Modified on 11/27/2018 (CBU)(dist made)
November 20, 2018 Filing 31 Minute Entry for telephonic status conference held 11/20/2018 before Judge Richard L. Young. Parties appear telephonically, plaintiff by Talcott Franklin and Andrea Ciobanu; defendants by Jessica Lindemann and Vincent Schmeltz, for a status conference. Deadlines shall be set by separate order. (Court Reporter Maggie Techert.) (TMD) (Main Document 31 replaced on 11/20/2018) (TMD).
November 20, 2018 Filing 30 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases , filed by Defendants EDUCATIONAL MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, EDUCOR, INC., HARRISON COLLEGE, JAMES HUTTON, KENNETH KONESCO, CRAIG PFANNENSTIEHL, GREGORY WALLIS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lindemann, Jessica)
November 20, 2018 Filing 29 Submission of Proposed Order Pursuant to Emergency Hearing, re #19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiffs MICHELLE BLATCHFORD, SARAH COVEY, MICHELLE DOTSON, KIMBRELY DURAND, DAYSHIA EDWARDS, STACY HAGER, HEATHER KELLEY, PENELOPE LEWIS, DEOMNI PAGE, NICOLLE SCHAFER, DARYANE SHADDAY, MELISSA SHAFFER, RAVEN STEINMETZ, CHRISTOPH WEBER. (Ciobanu, Andrea)
November 14, 2018 Filing 27 Minute Entry for telephonic conference regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction held 11/14/18 before Judge Richard L. Young. A Telephone Conference is set for 11/20/2018 at 2:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Judge Richard L. Young. The information to participate in this telephonic conference will be sent by separate order. (TMD)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Talcott J. Franklin for the Plaintiffs added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/14/2018. (CBU) Modified on 11/14/2018 (CBU)(dist made)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Vincent P. Schmeltz for Defendants added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/14/2018. (CBU)
November 14, 2018 Filing 24 RECEIPT #IP062837 for Pro Hac filing fee in the amount of $100, paid by Talcott Franklin. (REO)
November 13, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Attorney(s) Talcott J. Franklin to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiffs MICHELLE BLATCHFORD, SARAH COVEY, MICHELLE DOTSON, KIMBRELY DURAND, DAYSHIA EDWARDS, STACY HAGER, HEATHER KELLEY, PENELOPE LEWIS, DEOMNI PAGE, NICOLLE SCHAFER, DARYANE SHADDAY, MELISSA SHAFFER, RAVEN STEINMETZ, CHRISTOPH WEBER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification in Support to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ciobanu, Andrea)
November 13, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants MICHAEL CROWLEY, EDUCATIONAL MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, EDUCOR, INC., HARRISON COLLEGE, JAMES HUTTON, KENNETH KONESCO, CRAIG PFANNENSTIEHL, GREGORY WALLIS. (Lindemann, Jessica)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic Conference is set for 11/14/2018 at 2:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Judge Richard L. Young. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/13/2018.(TMD)
November 9, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiffs MICHELLE BLATCHFORD, SARAH COVEY, MICHELLE DOTSON, KIMBRELY DURAND, DAYSHIA EDWARDS, STACY HAGER, HEATHER KELLEY, PENELOPE LEWIS, DEOMNI PAGE, NICOLLE SCHAFER, DARYANE SHADDAY, MELISSA SHAFFER, RAVEN STEINMETZ, CHRISTOPH WEBER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order On Plaintiffs' Verified Request for Temporary Restraining Order Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 65(B))(Ciobanu, Andrea)
November 9, 2018 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EDUCATIONAL MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, EDUCOR, INC. identifying Other Affiliate Educational Management Corporation d/b/a Harrison College for EDUCOR, INC... (Lindemann, Jessica)
November 9, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to EDUCATIONAL MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, EDUCOR, INC., HARRISON COLLEGE. (LAB) (JRB)
November 8, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Vincent P. Schmeltz III to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5147898), filed by Defendants EDUCATIONAL MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, EDUCOR, INC., HARRISON COLLEGE, JAMES HUTTON, KENNETH KONESCO, CRAIG PFANNENSTIEHL, GREGORY WALLIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Vincent Schmeltz III, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lindemann, Jessica)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica M. Lindemann on behalf of Defendants EDUCATIONAL MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, EDUCOR, INC., HARRISON COLLEGE, JAMES HUTTON, KENNETH KONESCO, CRAIG PFANNENSTIEHL, GREGORY WALLIS. (Lindemann, Jessica)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Charles R. Webb added on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/31/2018 (dist made) (CBU)
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Charles R. Webb to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number IP062608), filed by Plaintiffs MICHELLE BLATCHFORD, MICHELLE DOTSON, DAYSHIA EDWARDS, STACY HAGER, DEOMNI PAGE, NICOLLE SCHAFER, DARYANE SHADDAY, MELISSA SHAFFER, RAVEN STEINMETZ, CHRISTOPH WEBER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(APD)
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Ciobanu, Andrea)
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 Alias Summons Issued as to MICHAEL CROWLEY, EDUCATIONAL MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, EDUCOR, INC., JAMES HUTTON, KENNETH KONESCO, GREGORY WALLIS. (TMB)
October 19, 2018 Filing 10 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to GREGORY WALLIS. (Ciobanu, Andrea)
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to KENNETH KONESCO. (Ciobanu, Andrea)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to JAMES HUTTON. (Ciobanu, Andrea)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to EDUCOR, INC.. (Ciobanu, Andrea)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to EDUCATIONAL MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. (Ciobanu, Andrea)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to MICHAEL CROWLEY. (Ciobanu, Andrea)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MICHAEL CROWLEY, EDUCATIONAL MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, EDUCOR, INC., HARRISON COLLEGE, JAMES HUTTON, KENNETH KONESCO, CRAIG PFANNENSTIEHL, and GREGORY WALLIS. (JRB)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Lynn Ciobanu on behalf of Plaintiffs MICHELLE BLATCHFORD, MICHELLE DOTSON, DAYSHIA EDWARDS, STACY HAGER, DEOMNI PAGE, NICOLLE SCHAFER, DARYANE SHADDAY, MELISSA SHAFFER, RAVEN STEINMETZ, CHRISTOPH WEBER. (Ciobanu, Andrea)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5106055) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Ciobanu, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EDWARDS et al v. HARRISON COLLEGE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARYANE SHADDAY
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Charles R. Webb
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA SHAFFER
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Charles R. Webb
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPH WEBER
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Charles R. Webb
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE DOTSON
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Charles R. Webb
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACY HAGER
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Charles R. Webb
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLLE SCHAFER
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Charles R. Webb
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAVEN STEINMETZ
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAYSHIA EDWARDS
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Charles R. Webb
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE BLATCHFORD
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Charles R. Webb
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEOMNI PAGE
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Charles R. Webb
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENELOPE LEWIS
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Charles R. Webb
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER KELLEY
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Charles R. Webb
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH COVEY
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Charles R. Webb
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBRELY DURAND
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Charles R. Webb
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG PFANNENSTIEHL
Represented By: Vincent P. Schmeltz
Represented By: Jessica M. Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRISON COLLEGE
Represented By: Vincent P. Schmeltz
Represented By: Jessica M. Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDUCATIONAL MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Represented By: Vincent P. Schmeltz
Represented By: Jessica M. Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CROWLEY
Represented By: Vincent P. Schmeltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH KONESCO
Represented By: Vincent P. Schmeltz
Represented By: Jessica M. Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES HUTTON
Represented By: Vincent P. Schmeltz
Represented By: Jessica M. Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY WALLIS
Represented By: Vincent P. Schmeltz
Represented By: Jessica M. Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDUCOR, INC.
Represented By: Vincent P. Schmeltz
Represented By: Jessica M. Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: ALLISON RANDLE
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Represented By: Carly Elizabeth Roseboom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: ASHLEY BRYANT
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Represented By: Carly Elizabeth Roseboom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: REBECCA NAUE
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Represented By: Carly Elizabeth Roseboom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: TIFFANIE GRIMM
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Represented By: Carly Elizabeth Roseboom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: ROBIN BOSTON
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Ciobanu
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Represented By: Carly Elizabeth Roseboom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?