CITY OF FRANKLIN et al v. PURDUE PHARMA L.P. et al
Plaintiff: TOWN OF PENDLETON, CITY OF FRANKLIN and CITY OF RICHMOND
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION, PURDUE PHARMA L.P., MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. N/K/A ACTAVIS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. N/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., ACTAVIS, LLC, THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., CEPHALON, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC. N/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ALLERGAN PLC F/K/A ACTAVIS PLS, NORAMCO, INC., PURDUE PHARMA INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. F/K/A/ WATSON PHARMA, INC., ALLERGAN PLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC. and ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03174
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 Remark - The Southern District of Indiana receives email notice from the Clerk of the Northern District of Ohio regarding electronic case transfer. This case was received electronically by the Northern District of Ohio on 10/26/2018 and was assigned case number 1:18-op-46182 in the receiving court. (MAC)
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Ohio, IN RE: MDL 2804 on October 25, 2018. (MAC)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION MDL No. 2804 Per Certified Transfer Order (CTO-61). (MAC)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MRI)
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ACTAVIS, LLC, ALLERGAN PLC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEPHALON, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NORAMCO, INC., ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PURDUE PHARMA INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (HET)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Andrew Knoll on behalf of Plaintiffs CITY OF FRANKLIN, CITY OF RICHMOND, TOWN OF PENDLETON. (Knoll, Jonathan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn A. Toops on behalf of Plaintiffs CITY OF FRANKLIN, CITY OF RICHMOND, TOWN OF PENDLETON. (Toops, Lynn)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Vess Allen Miller on behalf of Plaintiffs CITY OF FRANKLIN, CITY OF RICHMOND, TOWN OF PENDLETON. (Miller, Vess)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff S. Gibson on behalf of Plaintiffs CITY OF FRANKLIN, CITY OF RICHMOND, TOWN OF PENDLETON. (Gibson, Jeff)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Irwin B. Levin on behalf of Plaintiffs CITY OF FRANKLIN, CITY OF RICHMOND, TOWN OF PENDLETON. (Levin, Irwin)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E. Shevitz on behalf of Plaintiffs CITY OF FRANKLIN, CITY OF RICHMOND, TOWN OF PENDLETON. (Shevitz, Richard)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5106810) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Shevitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITY OF FRANKLIN et al v. PURDUE PHARMA L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. N/K/A ACTAVIS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. N/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL HEALTH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEPHALON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC. N/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC F/K/A ACTAVIS PLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORAMCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. F/K/A/ WATSON PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOWN OF PENDLETON
Represented By: Richard E. Shevitz
Represented By: Jeff S. Gibson
Represented By: Vess Allen Miller
Represented By: Irwin B. Levin
Represented By: Lynn A. Toops
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Knoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF FRANKLIN
Represented By: Richard E. Shevitz
Represented By: Jeff S. Gibson
Represented By: Vess Allen Miller
Represented By: Irwin B. Levin
Represented By: Lynn A. Toops
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Knoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF RICHMOND
Represented By: Richard E. Shevitz
Represented By: Jeff S. Gibson
Represented By: Vess Allen Miller
Represented By: Irwin B. Levin
Represented By: Lynn A. Toops
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Knoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?