BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. v. SALIN BANK AND TRUST COMPANY
Plaintiff: BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.
Defendant: SALIN BANK AND TRUST COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2018cv03263
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: William T Lawrence
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 18 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. . (Bradley, Jacob)
December 10, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, William T. Repasky hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Repasky, William)
December 5, 2018 Filing 16 Jurisdictional Statement Supplemental, re #14 Entry by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. (Bradley, Jacob)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Amended Motion for William T. Repasky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/28/2018. (SWM)
November 27, 2018 Filing 14 ENTRY - REGARDING JURISDICTIONAL ALLEGATIONS; It has come to the Court's attention that the jurisdictional allegations in the Complaint in this case are insufficient to establish the existence of complete diversity of citizenship between the parties. Specifically, the Plaintiff is a national banking organization. For purposes of diversity jurisdiction, the citizenship of a national bank is determined by the state of its principal place of business and the state listed in its organization certificate. The Complaint states that the Plaintiff's "main office, as designated in its articles of association" is in Chicago, Illinois. Dkt. No. 1-1. The Plaintiff must confirm that its jurisdictional allegations address both the state of its principal place of business and the state listed in its organization certificate. Within fourteen days of the date of this Entry, the Plaintiff shall file a supplemental jurisdictional statement that sets forth the specific information necessary to establish the diversity of citizenship of the parties to this case. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/27/2018. (CKM)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 Amended MOTION #9 for Attorney(s) William T. Repasky to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5159267) , filed by Defendant SALIN BANK AND TRUST COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of W. Repasky to Support Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Repasky))(Craig, Darren) Modified on 11/27/2018 (CMC).
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by SALIN BANK AND TRUST COMPANY.(Craig, Darren)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SALIN BANK AND TRUST COMPANY. (Craig, Darren)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 EXHIBIT re #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) William T. Repasky to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5159267) (Proposed) Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by SALIN BANK AND TRUST COMPANY. (Craig, Darren)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) William T. Repasky to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5159267), filed by Defendant SALIN BANK AND TRUST COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Pro Hac Vice Certification)(Craig, Darren)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Darren Andrew Craig on behalf of Defendant SALIN BANK AND TRUST COMPANY. (Craig, Darren)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Schmale on behalf of Defendant SALIN BANK AND TRUST COMPANY. (Schmale, Emily)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to SALIN BANK AND TRUST COMPANY. (HET)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucy Renee Dollens on behalf of Plaintiff BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. (Dollens, Lucy)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BMO HARRIS BANK N.A., Other Affiliate BMO FINANCIAL CORP. for BMO HARRIS BANK N.A... (Bradley, Jacob)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob V. Bradley on behalf of Plaintiff BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. (Bradley, Jacob)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SALIN BANK AND TRUST COMPANY, filed by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. (Filing Fee $400.00, receipt number 0756-5120948) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Bradley, Jacob) Modified on 10/24/2018 to add payment information.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. v. SALIN BANK AND TRUST COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALIN BANK AND TRUST COMPANY
Represented By: William T. Repasky
Represented By: Darren Andrew Craig
Represented By: Emily Schmale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.
Represented By: Jacob V. Bradley
Represented By: Lucy Renee Dollens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?