DORE v. ROLLS ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Plaintiff: JOHN DORE
Defendant: ROLLS ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03310
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: William T Lawrence
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2019 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/6/2018.(SWM)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant ROLLS ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (McHone, Koryn)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROLLS ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC. identifying Corporate Parent ROLLS-ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC. for ROLLS ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC... (McHone, Koryn)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Koryn Michelle McHone on behalf of Defendant ROLLS ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (McHone, Koryn)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Anthony Prather on behalf of Defendant ROLLS ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Prather, R.)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN of Service, filed by JOHN DORE. ROLLS ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC. served on 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Envelope A)(Cummings, Paul)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ROLLS ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC. (DJH)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN DORE. (Cummings, Paul)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Request for Jury Trial against ROLLS ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC., filed by JOHN DORE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5129401) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Cummings, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DORE v. ROLLS ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROLLS ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Represented By: Koryn Michelle McHone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DORE
Represented By: Paul J. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?