UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $56,380.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $56,380.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Claimant: ANGELA CARTER
Case Number: 1:2018cv03367
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
2 Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:18-cv-03367-RLY-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (REO)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 12/19/2018. (TMB)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE Regarding Angela Carter's Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Babbs, Eric)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Motion to Dismiss, filed by Claimant ANGELA CARTER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(SWM)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property issued by Clerk. Paper copies to USM.(JRB)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Parker Babbs on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Babbs, Eric)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT OF FORFEITURE IN REM against $56,380.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property)(Babbs, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $56,380.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $56,380.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Eric Parker Babbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ANGELA CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?