BRANSON v. USF HOLLAND, LLC et al

Plaintiff: JERRI ANN BRANSON
Defendant: USF HOLLAND, LLC and GORDON SMITH
Case Number: 1:2018cv03608
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants GORDON SMITH, USF HOLLAND, LLC . (Foos, Robert)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by GORDON SMITH, USF HOLLAND, LLC.(Foos, Robert)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2019 03:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/6/2018.(SWM)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 Submission of additional State Court records. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants GORDON SMITH, USF HOLLAND, LLC. (Foos, Robert)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendants GORDON SMITH, USF HOLLAND, LLC. (Foos, Robert)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USF HOLLAND, LLC identifying Other Affiliate YRC WORLDWIDE, INC. for USF HOLLAND, LLC.. (Foos, Robert)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R. Foos on behalf of Defendants GORDON SMITH, USF HOLLAND, LLC. (Foos, Robert)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from MARION SUPERIOR COURT 10, case number 49D10-1810-CT-040883, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5161823) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record (Complaint, Appearance, Summons x2, Return Service x2, Appearance, Jury Demand, MET, Order x2, MFL to Amend, Order))(Foos, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRANSON v. USF HOLLAND, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRI ANN BRANSON
Represented By: Jason A. Shartzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USF HOLLAND, LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GORDON SMITH
Represented By: Robert R. Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?