BRYANT v. NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION et al
Plaintiff: DAVID BRYANT
Defendant: BIG TEN CONFERENCE, NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION and THE BIG TEN CONFERENCE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03660
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by DAVID BRYANT. NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION waiver sent on 1/8/2019. (Circelli, Vincent)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to THE BIG TEN CONFERENCE, INC. (NAD)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to THE BIG TEN CONFERENCE, INC.. (Circelli, Vincent)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Vincent P. Circelli's #3 Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of DAVID BRYANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/3/2018. (SWM)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Vincent P. Circelli to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5173298), filed by Plaintiff DAVID BRYANT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Circelli, Vincent)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BIG TEN CONFERENCE, NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, filed by DAVID BRYANT. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5167685) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Circelli, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRYANT v. NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIG TEN CONFERENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BIG TEN CONFERENCE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BRYANT
Represented By: Vincent P. Circelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?