PARAGON BANK v. JJCB, LLC et al

Plaintiff: PARAGON BANK
Defendant: BRITTANY R MCCLARY, JUSTIN M FERRIELL, CHRISTIE A FERRIELL, JOHN R MCCLARY, JJCB, LLC, JOHN R. MCCLARY, BRITTANY R. MCCLARY, JUSTIN M. FERRIELL and CHRISTIE A. FERRIELL
Case Number: 1:2018cv03820
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
0 Judge: Matthew P Brookman
1 Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint to 3/7/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/31/2019. (JRB)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint to 3/7/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/31/2019. (JRB)
January 29, 2019 21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/07/2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants CHRISTIE A. FERRIELL, JUSTIN M. FERRIELL, JJCB, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Forrest, Adam) Modified on 1/30/2019 (JDH).
January 29, 2019 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to March 7, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants JJCB, LLC, BRITTANY R. MCCLARY, JOHN R. MCCLARY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maurovich, John)
January 29, 2019 18 RETURN of Service, filed by PARAGON BANK. CHRISTIE A. FERRIELL served on 1/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDH)
January 28, 2019 19 RETURN of Service, filed by PARAGON BANK. JUSTIN M. FERRIELL served on 1/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDH)
January 25, 2019 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Garth Forrest on behalf of Defendants CHRISTIE A. FERRIELL, JUSTIN M. FERRIELL, JJCB, LLC. (Forrest, Adam)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order 16 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2019 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/23/2019.(JRB)
January 3, 2019 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Curts on behalf of Defendants JJCB, LLC, BRITTANY R. MCCLARY, JOHN R. MCCLARY. (Curts, Jay)
January 2, 2019 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JJCB, LLC. (Maurovich, John)
January 2, 2019 13 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants JJCB, LLC, BRITTANY R. MCCLARY, JOHN R. MCCLARY. (Maurovich, John)
January 2, 2019 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John Vincent Maurovich on behalf of Defendants JJCB, LLC, BRITTANY R. MCCLARY, JOHN R. MCCLARY. (Maurovich, John)
December 17, 2018 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants, filed by PARAGON BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Loan Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Unconditional Guarantee - Justin Ferriell, #4 Exhibit D - Unconditional Guarantee - Christie Ferriell, #5 Exhibit E - Unconditional Guarantee - John McClary, #6 Exhibit F - Unconditional Guarantee - Brittany McClary)(Allen, Eric)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER - The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a Second Amended Complaint by December 21, 2018, which properly sets forth the citizenship of JJCB, LLC. Plaintiff must identify the members of JJCB, LLC, traced down to the lowest level, provide their corporate forms, and properly set forth their respective citizenships. Defendants need not answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint at which this Order is directed. Defendants are cautioned, however, that when they do respond to the Second Amended Complaint, and to the extent that they deny any of Plaintiff's jurisdictional allegations or state that they do not have sufficient information to respond to those allegations, the Court will require the parties to conduct whatever investigation is necessary and file a joint jurisdictional statement confirming that all parties are in agreement with the underlying jurisdictional allegations before the litigation moves forward. (See Order). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/13/2018.(JDH)
December 11, 2018 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff against All Defendants, filed by PARAGON BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Loan Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Unconditional Guarantee - Justin Ferriell, #4 Exhibit D - Unconditional Guarantee - Justin Ferriell, #5 Exhibit E - Unconditional Guarantee - John McClary, #6 Exhibit F - Unconditional Guarantee - Brittany McClary)(Allen, Eric)
December 7, 2018 8 Summons Issued as to CHRISTIE A. FERRIELL, JUSTIN M. FERRIELL, JJCB, LLC, BRITTANY R. MCCLARY, JOHN R. MCCLARY. (JDH)
December 7, 2018 7 Submission of Signature Requirement re #1 Complaint by PARAGON BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Loan Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Unconditional Guarantee - Justin Ferriell, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Unconditional Guarantee - Christie Ferriell, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Unconditional Guarantee - John McClary, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Unconditional Guarantee - Brittany McClary)(Allen, Eric)
December 6, 2018 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER - The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint by December 20, 2018, which addresses the issues outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Court's diversity jurisdiction. Defendants need not answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint at which this Order is directed. Defendants are cautioned, however, that when they do respond to the Amended Complaint, and to the extent that they deny any of Plaintiff's jurisdictional allegations or state that they do not have sufficient information to respond to those allegations, the Court will require the parties to conduct whatever investigation is necessary and file a joint jurisdictional statement confirming that all parties are in agreement with the underlying jurisdictional allegations before the litigation moves forward. (See Order). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/6/2018.(JDH)
December 6, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric N. Allen on behalf of Plaintiff PARAGON BANK. (Allen, Eric)
December 5, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David Vernon Chandler on behalf of Plaintiff PARAGON BANK. (Chandler, David)
December 5, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PARAGON BANK identifying Corporate Parent PARAGON FINANCIAL SOLUTIONS for PARAGON BANK.. (Chandler, David)
December 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT For Damages against All Defendants, filed by PARAGON BANK. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5184139) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Loan Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Unconditional Guarantee - Justin Ferriell, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Unconditional Guarantee - Christie Ferriell, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Unconditional Guarantee - John McClary, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Unconditional Guarantee - Brittany McClary, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons)(Chandler, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARAGON BANK v. JJCB, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRITTANY R MCCLARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTIN M FERRIELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIE A FERRIELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN R MCCLARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJCB, LLC
Represented By: Jay Curts
Represented By: Adam Garth Forrest
Represented By: John Vincent Maurovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN R. MCCLARY
Represented By: Jay Curts
Represented By: John Vincent Maurovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRITTANY R. MCCLARY
Represented By: Jay Curts
Represented By: John Vincent Maurovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTIN M. FERRIELL
Represented By: Adam Garth Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIE A. FERRIELL
Represented By: Adam Garth Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARAGON BANK
Represented By: David Vernon Chandler
Represented By: Eric N. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?