ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP. v. BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST
Plaintiff: ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.
Defendant: BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST
Counter Claimant: BAR HARBOR TRUST SERVICES and CHARTER TRUST COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2018cv03917
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting Parties' #85 Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Deadlines. See Order for established deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/28/2020.(SWM)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Entry from Status Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for a status conference on August 24, 2020, with the magistrate judge. The conference was held and concluded without further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/24/2020 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/11/2020.(SWM)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 SCHEDULING ORDER - In light of the Order Granting Parties Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Plan Deadlines [Dkt. 82], the jury trial currently set for Monday, March 1, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. in Room 216 of the United States Courthouse in Indianapolis, Indiana and the final pretrial conference currently set for Tuesday, February 16, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. in Room 216 of the United States Courthouse in Indianapolis, Indiana are hereby VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference is reset for 10/5/2021 02:00 PM in room #216, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Jury Trial is set for 10/18/2021 09:30 AM in room #216, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. (CKM)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/24/2020 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/11/2020.(SWM)
August 7, 2020 Filing 85 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to Extend Case Management Deadlines, filed by Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pitney, Julia) Modified on 8/10/2020 (CKM). Modified on 8/10/2020 (CKM).
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER - granting #72 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 5/22/2020. *** SEE ORDER **** (CKM)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #79 APPROVED AND ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/12/2020.(SWM)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting Parties' #78 Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Deadlines. See Order for established deadlines. The November 7, 2019 Entry [Dkt. 76], which sets a final pretrial conference for February 16, 2021, and a jury trial to begin on March 1, 2021, will be addressed in a subsequent Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/12/2020.(SWM)
February 10, 2020 Filing 81 Submission of Proposed Order , re #79 Joint MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST, Counter Claimants BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST, BAR HARBOR TRUST SERVICES, CHARTER TRUST COMPANY. (Goodknight, Libby)
February 10, 2020 Filing 80 Submission of Proposed Order , re #78 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #70 Order on MotionScheduling Case Management Deadlines, filed by Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST, Counter Claimants BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST, BAR HARBOR TRUST SERVICES, CHARTER TRUST COMPANY. (Goodknight, Libby)
February 7, 2020 Filing 79 Joint MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order)(Goodknight, Libby)
February 7, 2020 Filing 78 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #70 Order on MotionScheduling Case Management Deadlines, filed by Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodknight, Libby)
November 14, 2019 Filing 77 REPLY in Support of Motion re #72 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM /Counterclaim Plaintiffs Counterclaim for Misrepresentation-Fraud , filed by Counter Defendants ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Alerding, Michael)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 SCHEDULING ORDER - In light of the Order Granting Parties' Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Plan Deadlines entered on October 16, 2019 [Dkt. 70], the jury trial currently set for Monday, October 19, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. in Room 216 of the United States Courthouse in Indianapolis, Indiana and the final pretrial conference currently set for Tuesday, October 6, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. in Room 216 of the United States Courthouse in Indianapolis, Indiana are hereby VACATED. This final pretrial conference is RESET for Tuesday, February 16, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. in Room 216 of the United States Courthouse in Indianapolis, Indiana and the jury trial is RESET for Monday, March 1, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. in Room 216 of the United States Courthouse in Indianapolis, Indiana. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/7/2019.(NAD)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ENTRY ON MOTION TO DISMISS ACCUTECH SYTEMS CORP.'S COUNTERCLAIMS; Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims; This matter is before the Court on Counterclaim-Defendants Bar Harbor Trusts Services and Charter Trust Company's Motion to Dismiss Accutech Systems Corp.'s Counterclaims [Dkt. 63] and Accutech Systems Corp.'s response thereto [Dkt. 66]. Accutech System Corp.'s counterclaims against Counterclaim-Defendants Bar Harbor Trusts Services and Charter Trust Company for intentional interference with contract are based in part on the original Complaint that was filed in this matter prior to removal. The Counterclaim-Defendants' request for dismissal relies on the insufficiency of the original Complaint, which was dismissed pursuant to the Court's Order of August 20, 2019 [Dkt. 60]. Accutech System Corp. has since filed its Amended Complaint on September 19, 2019 [Dkt. 65]. Accordingly, Counterclaim- Defendants. Bar Harbor Trusts Services and Charter Trust Company's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims is DENIED AS MOOT #63 . Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 10/31/2019. (CKM)
October 31, 2019 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re #72 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM /Counterclaim Plaintiffs Counterclaim for Misrepresentation-Fraud , filed by Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Piampiano, Jeffrey)
October 17, 2019 Filing 73 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #72 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM /Counterclaim Plaintiffs Counterclaim for Misrepresentation-Fraud , filed by Counter Defendants ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Alerding, Michael)
October 17, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM /Counterclaim Plaintiffs Counterclaim for Misrepresentation-Fraud, filed by Counter Defendants ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alerding, Michael)
October 17, 2019 Filing 71 ANSWER to Counterclaim, filed by Counter Defendants ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Alerding, Michael)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting Parties' #68 Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Deadlines (see Order for established deadlines). The February 12, 2019 Entry [Dkt. 42], which sets a final pretrial conference for October 6, 2020, and a jury trial to begin on October 19, 2020, shall be addressed in a subsequent Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/16/2019.(SWM)
October 11, 2019 Filing 69 Submission of Proposed Order , re #68 Joint MOTION to Amend Case Management Deadlines, filed by Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Goodknight, Libby)
October 11, 2019 Filing 68 Joint MOTION to Amend Case Management Deadlines, filed by Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Goodknight, Libby)
October 3, 2019 Filing 67 ANSWER to #65 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., filed by BAR HARBOR TRUST SERVICES, BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST, CHARTER TRUST COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Proposal for a Trust Accounting System Solution, #2 Exhibit Request-Response for Proposal for a Trust Accounting System Solution, #3 Exhibit SAAS Master Services Agreement, #4 Exhibit 2018-07-06 Correspondence from J. Pratt to A. Unger, #5 Exhibit 2018-10-19 Correspondence from J. Pratt to A. Unger)(Pitney, Julia)
September 19, 2019 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re #63 MOTION to Dismiss Accutech's Counterclaims , filed by Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Counter Defendant ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Alerding, Michael)
September 19, 2019 Filing 65 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST, BAR HARBOR TRUST SERVICES, CHARTER TRUST COMPANY, filed by ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-Cure Notice, #3 Exhibit C-Termination Notice)(Alerding, Michael) Modified on 9/20/2019 (CKM).
August 30, 2019 Filing 64 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #63 MOTION to Dismiss Accutech's Counterclaims , filed by Counter Claimant CHARTER TRUST COMPANY. (Pitney, Julia)
August 30, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss Accutech's Counterclaims, filed by Counter Claimant CHARTER TRUST COMPANY. (Pitney, Julia)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Julia E. Dimick withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/26/2019. (SWM)
August 23, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance , filed by Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Counter Defendant ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dimick, Julia)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER - granting #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED without prejudice with leave to replead within 30 days. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/20/2019. (CKM)
August 12, 2019 Filing 59 ANSWER to Bar Harbor Trust Services and Charter Trust Company's Breach of Contract Counterclaim and Accutech Systems Corp.'s Counterclaims Against Bar Harbor Trust Services and Charter Trust Company, filed by Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Counter Defendant ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Alerding, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to dismiss, ECF No. #39 , is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART: The motion is GRANTED as to Count I, fraud in the inducement. Count I is DISMISSED. The motion is DENIED as to Count II, breach of contract. The motion for oral argument, ECF No. #48 , is DENIED. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 7/29/2019. *** SEE ORDER *** (CKM)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting Parties' #56 Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Deadline Regarding Amending Pleadings and Adding Parties. All motions for leave to amend the pleadings and/or to join additional parties shall be filed by a Party within fifteen (15) days of the Court's ruling on its pending motion to dismiss. Nothing in this order is intended to, or shall, limit the rights of the Parties to file amended pleadings where such amendments are expressly permitted by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or applicable local rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/9/2019. (SWM)
May 7, 2019 Filing 56 Joint MOTION to Modify Case Management Deadline Regarding Amending Pleadings and Adding Parties, filed by Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Counter Defendant ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alerding, Michael)
April 26, 2019 Filing 55 Witness List Preliminary, filed by Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Pitney, Julia)
April 26, 2019 Filing 54 Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Pitney, Julia)
April 26, 2019 Filing 53 Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Counter Defendant ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Witness List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Counter Defendant ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Alerding, Michael)
April 19, 2019 Filing 52 Witness List Preliminary, filed by Counter Claimants BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST, BAR HARBOR TRUST SERVICES, CHARTER TRUST COMPANY, Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Pitney, Julia)
April 19, 2019 Filing 51 Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Counter Claimants BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST, BAR HARBOR TRUST SERVICES, CHARTER TRUST COMPANY, Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Pitney, Julia)
April 19, 2019 Filing 50 Witness List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Counter Defendant ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Counter Defendant ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Alerding, Michael)
April 9, 2019 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION for Oral Argument on Counterclaim-Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims , filed by Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Counter Defendant ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Alerding, Michael)
April 1, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Oral Argument on Counterclaim-Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims, filed by Counter Claimants BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST, BAR HARBOR TRUST SERVICES, CHARTER TRUST COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Piampiano, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2019 Filing 47 REPLY in Support of Motion re #39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Counter Defendant ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Alerding, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER on Motion for Extension of Time: On March 6, 2019, plaintiff-counterclaim defendant Accutech Systems Corp. filed an unopposed motion for a fifteen- day extension of the deadline to file a reply in support to its motion to dismiss (Dkt. #45 ). The motion was filed one day before the deadline and therefore does not comply with Local Rule 6-1(a)(5). Because the motion does not comply with Local Rule 6-1(a)(5), it is DENIED. Nevertheless, the court determines that the interest of justice counsels in favor of extending the deadline to avoid too harsh a consequence that could result from an outright denial. Plaintiff-counterclaim defendant Accutech shall file its reply brief on or before March 22, 2019. Counsel must take care to fully comply with all local rules and court orders in the future. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/7/2019. (SWM)
March 6, 2019 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to 3/22/2019 re #39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Counter Defendant ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alerding, Michael)
February 28, 2019 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (1) Counterclaim-Plaintiffs' Counterclaim for Misrepresentation/Fraud; and (2) Bar Harbor Trust Services' and Charter Trust Company's Counterclaim for Breach of Contract, filed by Counter Claimants BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST, BAR HARBOR TRUST SERVICES, CHARTER TRUST COMPANY. (Piampiano, Jeffrey)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Entry and Order from Settlement Conference - The plaintiff, in person and by counsel, and the defendant, by its authorized representatives and by counsel, appeared for a settlement conference on February 22, 2019, with the magistrate judge. The conference was held and concluded without settlement. The proposed case management plan at Dkt. #38 is approved and entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SCHEDULING ORDER - Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2020 02:00 PM in room #216, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020 09:30 AM in room #216, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. (CKM)
February 7, 2019 Filing 41 Accutech Systems Corp.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Bar Harbor Bank & Trust's Breach of Contract Counterclaim ANSWER to #21 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim , filed by ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP..(Alerding, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Filing 40 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Counter Defendant ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Alerding, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Counter Defendant ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alerding, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS SUBMITTED. Dispositive Motions due by 12/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/6/2019.(SWM)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MARGINAL ENTRY re Parties' #35 Agreed request that the Court reconsider its January 30, 2019 Order Setting Settlement Conference and Related Deadlines [Docket No. 34], and set deadlines for submitting demands on claims and counterclaims. The court grants this request. But it reminds counsel that a motion of this nature must comply with Local Rule 6-1, including stating the original deadline and giving a reason for the request. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/4/2019. (SWM)
February 4, 2019 Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Counter Defendant ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP. . (Alerding, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Filing 35 Consent MOTION for Continuance re #34 Scheduling Order , filed by Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Counter Defendant ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alerding, Michael) Modified on 2/4/2019 (CKM).
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference and Related Deadlines: Settlement Conference set for 2/22/2019 01:30 PM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. On or before three (3) business days before the conference, the parties shall submit (not file) a confidential settlement statement. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/30/2019.(SWM)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting Defendant's #32 Motion for Early Settlement Conference and to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference. The February 11, 2019 Initial Pretrial Conference is VACATED and will be rescheduled for a later date if necessary. A settlement conference will be set for February 22, 2019, by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/30/2019.(SWM)
January 25, 2019 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance Initial Pretrial Conference and Motion for Early Settlement Conference, filed by Counter Claimants BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST, BAR HARBOR TRUST SERVICES, CHARTER TRUST COMPANY, Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodknight, Libby)
January 11, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Counter Claimant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST, Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Goodknight, Libby)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2019 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/10/2019.(SWM)
January 7, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Counter Defendant ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Alerding, Michael)
January 4, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., Counter Defendant ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Alerding, Michael)
December 21, 2018 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHARTER TRUST COMPANY. (Goodknight, Libby)
December 21, 2018 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAR HARBOR TRUST SERVICES. (Goodknight, Libby)
December 21, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia G. Pitney on behalf of Counter Claimants BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST, BAR HARBOR TRUST SERVICES, CHARTER TRUST COMPANY. (Pitney, Julia)
December 21, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Piampiano on behalf of Counter Claimants BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST, BAR HARBOR TRUST SERVICES, CHARTER TRUST COMPANY. (Piampiano, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Barkimer on behalf of Counter Claimants BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST, BAR HARBOR TRUST SERVICES, CHARTER TRUST COMPANY. (Barkimer, William)
December 21, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Libby Yin Goodknight on behalf of Counter Claimants BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST, BAR HARBOR TRUST SERVICES, CHARTER TRUST COMPANY. (Goodknight, Libby)
December 21, 2018 Filing 21 Bar Harbor Bank & Trust's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP., filed by BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST, BAR HARBOR TRUST SERVICES, CHARTER TRUST COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for Proposal for a Trust Accounting System Solution dated June 20, 2017, #2 Exhibit B - Accutech's Response to Request for Proposal for a Trust Accounting System Solution, #3 Exhibit C - MSA and related SOW, #4 Exhibit D - July 6, 2018 E-Mail, #5 Exhibit E - October 18, 2018 Letter)(Goodknight, Libby)
December 19, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Scott Alan Kreider hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Kreider, Scott)
December 19, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Julia E. Dimick hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Dimick, Julia)
December 14, 2018 Filing 18 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Goodknight, Libby)
December 14, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Goodknight, Libby)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Julia G. Pitney for BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Julia G. Pitney register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by December 27, 2018. Failure to register could result in the revocation of her admission pro hac vice. Copy to Julia G. Pitney via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/14/2018. (SWM)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Jeffrey T. Piampiano for BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Jeffrey T. Piampiano register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by December 27, 2018. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to Jeffrey T. Piampiano via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/14/2018. (SWM)
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia E. Dimick on behalf of Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Dimick, Julia)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Alan Kreider on behalf of Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Kreider, Scott)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Alerding, Michael)
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Alerding on behalf of Plaintiff ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.. (Alerding, Michael)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal by BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SCC: Docket Sheet, Appearance, Complaint, Summons, Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint)(Goodknight, Libby)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT re #6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Julia G. Pitney to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5194829) by BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Goodknight, Libby)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT re #5 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeffrey T. Piampiano to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5194824) by BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Goodknight, Libby)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Julia G. Pitney to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5194829), filed by Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Julia G. Pitney, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodknight, Libby)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeffrey T. Piampiano to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5194824), filed by Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certification of Jeffrey T. Piampiano, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodknight, Libby)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Barkimer on behalf of Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Barkimer, William)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Goodknight, Libby)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Libby Yin Goodknight on behalf of Defendant BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Goodknight, Libby)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Delaware Circuit Court, case number 18C05-1811-PL-000106, filed by BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5194733) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet B - Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodknight, Libby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP. v. BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACCUTECH SYSTEMS CORP.
Represented By: Julia E. Dimick
Represented By: Scott Alan Kreider
Represented By: Michael J. Alerding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST
Represented By: William J. Barkimer
Represented By: Libby Yin Goodknight
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Piampiano
Represented By: Julia G. Pitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: BAR HARBOR TRUST SERVICES
Represented By: William J. Barkimer
Represented By: Libby Yin Goodknight
Represented By: Julia G. Pitney
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Piampiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: CHARTER TRUST COMPANY
Represented By: William J. Barkimer
Represented By: Libby Yin Goodknight
Represented By: Julia G. Pitney
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Piampiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?