ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV et al v. ABDUCTION SMOKE & VAPE SHOP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC. and ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV
Defendant: ABDUCTION SMOKE & VAPE SHOP, INC., VERONICA SHUMAKER, MICHAEL SCHUMAKER and ABDUCTION SMOKE & VAPE SHOP INC
Case Number: 1:2018cv03927
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SREAM, INC.. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OR RELATED CASES, filed by Plaintiffs ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV, SREAM, INC. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SREAM, INC.. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DWH)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to ABDUCTION SMOKE & VAPE SHOP INC, MICHAEL SCHUMAKER, and VERONICA SHUMAKER. (DJH)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan G. Chance on behalf of Plaintiffs ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV, SREAM, INC.. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5196716) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Chance, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV et al v. ABDUCTION SMOKE & VAPE SHOP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABDUCTION SMOKE & VAPE SHOP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERONICA SHUMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL SCHUMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABDUCTION SMOKE & VAPE SHOP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan G. Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV
Represented By: Jonathan G. Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?