ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV et al v. EIGHTH WONDER et al

Plaintiff: SREAM, INC. and ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV
Defendant: EIGHTH WONDER and JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2018cv04002
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
0 Judge: Tim A Baker
1 Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants JOHN DOE, EIGHTH WONDER. (Doss, William)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William Kenneth Doss on behalf of Defendants JOHN DOE, EIGHTH WONDER. (Doss, William)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES, filed by Plaintiffs ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV, SREAM, INC. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SREAM, INC.. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 Exhibit 1) (JDC)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EIGHTH WONDER. (REO)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan G. Chance on behalf of Plaintiffs ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV, SREAM, INC.. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5205758) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPTO recordation, #2 Exhibit ROOR Trademark registration, #3 Exhibit License agreement, #4 Exhibit Ratification, #5 Exhibit Product for Sale, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Chance, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV et al v. EIGHTH WONDER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EIGHTH WONDER
Represented By: William Kenneth Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Represented By: William Kenneth Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan G. Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV
Represented By: Jonathan G. Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?