ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV et al v. KOCOLENE MARKETING, LLC et al

Plaintiff: SREAM, INC. and ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV
Defendant: DOUGLAS L. PRATHER, KOCOLENE MARKETING, LLC, KEVIN JOHNSON and J. KEVIN JOHNSON
Case Number: 1:2018cv04023
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
0 Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
1 Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2019 at 9:00 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/29/2019.(CBU)
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants J. KEVIN JOHNSON, KOCOLENE MARKETING, LLC, DOUGLAS L. PRATHER. (Pinkus, Craig)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KOCOLENE MARKETING, LLC. (Pinkus, Craig)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip R. Zimmerly on behalf of Defendants J. KEVIN JOHNSON, KOCOLENE MARKETING, LLC, DOUGLAS L. PRATHER. (Zimmerly, Philip)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Eldon Pinkus on behalf of Defendants J. KEVIN JOHNSON, KOCOLENE MARKETING, LLC, DOUGLAS L. PRATHER. (Pinkus, Craig)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES, filed by Plaintiffs ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV, SREAM, INC. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages) (NAD)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to J. KEVIN JOHNSON, KOCOLENE MARKETING, LLC, DOUGLAS L. PRATHER. (REO)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SREAM, INC.. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan G. Chance on behalf of Plaintiffs ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV, SREAM, INC.. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5207752) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPTO Notice of Recordation, #2 Exhibit Roor Trademark registrations, #3 Exhibit License agreement, #4 Exhibit Ratification Agreement, #5 Exhibit Product Offered for Sale, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Chance, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV et al v. KOCOLENE MARKETING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS L. PRATHER
Represented By: Craig Eldon Pinkus
Represented By: Philip R. Zimmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOCOLENE MARKETING, LLC
Represented By: Craig Eldon Pinkus
Represented By: Philip R. Zimmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. KEVIN JOHNSON
Represented By: Craig Eldon Pinkus
Represented By: Philip R. Zimmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan G. Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV
Represented By: Jonathan G. Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?