ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV et al v. RICHMOND MASTER DISTRIBUTORS, INC.

Plaintiff: SREAM, INC. and ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV
Defendant: PATRICK A. CARRICO, RICHMOND MASTER DISTRIBUTORS, INC. D/B/A LOW BOB'S 860 and RICHMOND MASTER DISTRIBUTORS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv04051
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
0 Judge: Matthew P Brookman
1 Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela L. Freel on behalf of Defendants PATRICK A. CARRICO, RICHMOND MASTER DISTRIBUTORS, INC.. (Freel, Angela)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RICHMOND MASTER DISTRIBUTORS, INC.. (Zalas, Clint)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/14/2019.(JRB)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Complaint to 3/11/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/13/2019. (JRB)
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to RICHMOND MASTER DISTRIBUTORS, INC. (LAB) (JRB)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 11, 2019 in which to #1 Complaint , filed by Defendants PATRICK A. CARRICO, RICHMOND MASTER DISTRIBUTORS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Extension of Time)(Zalas, Clint)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint Anthony Zalas on behalf of Defendants PATRICK A. CARRICO, RICHMOND MASTER DISTRIBUTORS, INC.. (Zalas, Clint)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES, filed by Plaintiffs ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV, SREAM, INC. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to PATRICK A. CARRICO and RICHMOND MASTER DISTRIBUTORS, INC. (JRB)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JRB)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SREAM, INC.. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan G. Chance on behalf of Plaintiffs ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV, SREAM, INC.. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5211991) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPTO REGISTRATION, #2 Exhibit Trademark Registration, #3 Exhibit License Agreement, #4 Exhibit Ratification Agreement, #5 Exhibit Product Offered for Sale, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Chance, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV et al v. RICHMOND MASTER DISTRIBUTORS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan G. Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV
Represented By: Jonathan G. Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK A. CARRICO
Represented By: Clint Anthony Zalas
Represented By: Angela L. Freel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHMOND MASTER DISTRIBUTORS, INC. D/B/A LOW BOB'S 860
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHMOND MASTER DISTRIBUTORS, INC.
Represented By: Clint Anthony Zalas
Represented By: Angela L. Freel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?