STOHLER v. EBEYER
Plaintiff: TANYA STOHLER
Defendant: ANTHONY EBEYER
Case Number: 1:2019cv00098
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Parties' #11 Joint Motion to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines. The Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for March 6, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED and will be reset after the filing of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/1/2019.(SWM)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Defendant's #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 4/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/1/2019. (SWM)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to April 1, 2019 to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant ANTHONY EBEYER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roy, Daniel)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines, filed by Plaintiff TANYA STOHLER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brinkerhoff, William)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2019 at 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/30/2019. (MAC)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Parties First Extension of Time filed by Defendant ANTHONY EBEYER, re #1 Complaint. (Roy, Daniel) Modified on 1/29/2019 (JDC).
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Richard Elliott on behalf of Defendant ANTHONY EBEYER. (Elliott, Matthew)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Ryan Roy on behalf of Defendant ANTHONY EBEYER. (Roy, Daniel)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ANTHONY EBEYER. (HET)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Kaufman Joseph on behalf of Plaintiff TANYA STOHLER. (Joseph, Hannah)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Brinkerhoff on behalf of Plaintiff TANYA STOHLER. (Brinkerhoff, William)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANTHONY EBEYER, filed by TANYA STOHLER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5231746) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Brinkerhoff, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STOHLER v. EBEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANYA STOHLER
Represented By: William J. Brinkerhoff
Represented By: Hannah Kaufman Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY EBEYER
Represented By: Daniel Ryan Roy
Represented By: Matthew Richard Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?