DORSEY v. J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC.

Plaintiff: RUSS DORSEY
Defendant: J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC, and J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00137
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
0 Judge: Matthew P Brookman
1 Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC. identifying Corporate Parent J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT SERVICES, INC. for J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC... (Moore, J.)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Ronald G. Polly, Jr for J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC. added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/21/2019. (JRB)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Matthew A. Boyd for J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC. added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/21/2019. (JRB)
February 21, 2019 Filing 15 Submission of Proposed Order , re #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew A. Boyd of Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5293877), filed by Defendant J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC.. (Moore, J.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 Submission of Proposed Order , re #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ronald G. Polly, Jr., of Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5293810), filed by Defendant J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC.. (Moore, J.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew A. Boyd of Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5293877), filed by Defendant J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, J.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ronald G. Polly, Jr., of Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5293810), filed by Defendant J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, J.)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2019 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/14/2019.(JRB)
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC.. (LAB) (JDC)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC..(Moore, J.)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Richard Moore on behalf of Defendant J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC.. (Moore, J.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by RUSS DORSEY. J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC. served on 1/22/2019. (Cleveland, Jason)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Spenser Garrett Benge on behalf of Plaintiff RUSS DORSEY. (Benge, Spenser)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC.. (HET)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason P. Cleveland on behalf of Plaintiff RUSS DORSEY. (Cleveland, Jason)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC,, filed by RUSS DORSEY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5236563) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Cleveland, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DORSEY v. J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSS DORSEY
Represented By: Jason P. Cleveland
Represented By: Spenser Garrett Benge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC.
Represented By: J. Richard Moore
Represented By: Ronald G. Polly, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew A. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?