GLASS v. NATIONAL CREDITORS CONNECTION, INC.
Plaintiff: KARL GLASS
Defendant: NATIONAL CREDITORS CONNECTION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00139
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) and the Plaintiff's #14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, this case has been CLOSED. TEXT-ONLY: There is no pdf document associated with this entry. (TMD)
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff KARL GLASS. (Philipps, David)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this matter. Accordingly, any pending motions are denied, without prejudice, as moot, and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are vacated. Parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within 45 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/1/2019.(SWM)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2019 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties themselves may participate at their option. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 2/25/2019.(SWM)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of Service, filed by KARL GLASS. NATIONAL CREDITORS CONNECTION, INC. served on 1/18/2019. (Philipps, David)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL CREDITORS CONNECTION, INC.. (Levi, Nicholas)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant NATIONAL CREDITORS CONNECTION, INC.. (Levi, Nicholas)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Ward Levi on behalf of Defendant NATIONAL CREDITORS CONNECTION, INC.. (Levi, Nicholas)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL CREDITORS CONNECTION, INC. (JRB)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff KARL GLASS. (Steinkamp, John)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angie K. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff KARL GLASS. (Robertson, Angie)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff KARL GLASS. (Philipps, Mary)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff KARL GLASS. (Philipps, David)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL CREDITORS CONNECTION, INC., filed by KARL GLASS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5237352) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Indiana Secretary of State Corporate Information, #2 Exhibit B - NMLS State License Information, #3 Exhibit C - Collection Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLASS v. NATIONAL CREDITORS CONNECTION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARL GLASS
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL CREDITORS CONNECTION, INC.
Represented By: Nicholas Ward Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?