MT. HELIX ACQUISITIONS I, LLC v. SPEARMAN GROUP LLC et al
Plaintiff: MT. HELIX ACQUISITIONS I, LLC
Defendant: BOARD OF PUBLIC WORKS, CONSOLIDATED CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, SPEARMAN GROUP LLC, HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION FO MARION COUNTY, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT AT 2958 NORTH DELAWARE STREET, INDIANAPOLIS, IN 46205 and WORLD
Case Number: 1:2019cv00197
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 Transfer Letter to the Clerk of the Marion Circuit Court. Copies of case documents and docket enclosed. (JDC)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLOSED REMANDED - This matter is before the Court on the Disclaimer of Interest and Motion to Remand to State Court #7 , and the Court, having read the same and being fully advised in the premises, hereby dismisses the United States of America, Internal Revenue Service, as a party to this action provided its redemption rights under 28 U.S.C. ' 2410(c) as to any liens other than those set out in the complaint are acknowledged in the final judgment entered in this case. The Court, having reviewed the Motion and being duly advised in the premises, now GRANTS it. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this matter is HEREBY remanded to Marion Circuit Court, Cause No. 49C01-1812-PL- 048604. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 2/14/2019. (JDC)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand and Disclaimer of Interest, filed by Defendant U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Childress, John)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting United States' #2 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Responsive Pleading to 2/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 2/8/2019. (MAC)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Submission of Additional State Court Records filed by Marion County Clerk's Office. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDC)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Childress on behalf of Defendant U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Childress, John)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 17, 2019 in which to #1 Notice of Removal , filed by Defendant U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Childress, John)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Circuit Court, case number 49C01-1812-PL-048604, filed by U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Childress, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MT. HELIX ACQUISITIONS I, LLC v. SPEARMAN GROUP LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARD OF PUBLIC WORKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By: John E. Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEARMAN GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION FO MARION COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN OCCUPANT AT 2958 NORTH DELAWARE STREET, INDIANAPOLIS, IN 46205
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MT. HELIX ACQUISITIONS I, LLC
Represented By: Steven Christopher Striebeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?