BELL v. EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT LLC
Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Defendant: EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00209
Filed: January 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A&B) (JDC)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. (Bell, Richard)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT LLC served on 1/25/2019. (Bell, Richard)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT LLC. (DJH)
January 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard N. Bell on behalf of Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Bell, Richard)
January 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT LLC, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5245505) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-INDIANAPOLIS PHOTO, #2 Exhibit B-COPY OF DEFENDANT'S INFRINGEMENT, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Proposed Summons)(Bell, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELL v. EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Represented By: Richard N. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?