CALDWELL v. RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC
Plaintiff: BRENDA CALDWELL
Defendant: RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC, d/b/a RMP, LLC and RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00549
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff BRENDA CALDWELL. (Philipps, David)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this matter. Accordingly, any pending motions are denied, without prejudice, as moot, and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are vacated. Parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within 45 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/8/2019.(SWM)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC served on 2/12/2019. (Philipps, David)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent RMP GROUP, INC. for RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC.. (Levi, Nicholas)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC. (Levi, Nicholas)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Ward Levi on behalf of Defendant RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC. (Levi, Nicholas)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 Summons (Alias) Issued as to RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC. (DWH)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC. (Philipps, David)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff BRENDA CALDWELL. (Steinkamp, John)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC. (HET)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angie K. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff BRENDA CALDWELL. (Robertson, Angie)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff BRENDA CALDWELL. (Philipps, Mary)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff BRENDA CALDWELL. (Philipps, David)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC, d/b/a RMP, LLC, filed by BRENDA CALDWELL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5269393) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Indiana Secretary of State Corporate Information, #2 Exhibit B - NMLS State License Information, #3 Exhibit C - Bankruptcy Notice, #4 Exhibit D - excerpt of Bankruptcy Schedule, #5 Exhibit E - Collection Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CALDWELL v. RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC, d/b/a RMP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Ward Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA CALDWELL
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?