SCHLAGEL v. MOALIM et al

Plaintiff: MILDRED SCHLAGEL
Defendant: CARDINAL EXPRESS, LLC and MOHAMED MOALIM
Case Number: 1:2019cv00590
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 9/6/2019. Discovery due by 4/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/12/2019.(SWM)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/12/2019. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended, to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/21/2019 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 5/1/2020 at 1:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/12/2019.(SWM)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Defendants' Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff MILDRED SCHLAGEL. (Faultless, Scott)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - More than 30 days have passed since the filing of the notice of removal, yet Plaintiff has not moved to remand or filed a response. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to comply with Local Rule 81-1 by March 26, 2019. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 3/12/2019.(DWH)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants CARDINAL EXPRESS, LLC, MOHAMED MOALIM and Plaintiff Mildred Schlagel. (Whitten, Christopher)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Trial by Jury, filed by CARDINAL EXPRESS, LLC, MOHAMED MOALIM.(Whitten, Christopher)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2019 03:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/15/2019.(SWM)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CARDINAL EXPRESS, LLC. (Whitten, Christopher)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants CARDINAL EXPRESS, LLC, MOHAMED MOALIM. (Whitten, Christopher)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Whitten on behalf of Defendants CARDINAL EXPRESS, LLC, MOHAMED MOALIM. (Whitten, Christopher)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Culp on behalf of Defendants CARDINAL EXPRESS, LLC, MOHAMED MOALIM. (Culp, James)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court 4, case number 49D04-1901-CT-000196, filed by CARDINAL EXPRESS, LLC, MOHAMED MOALIM. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5276980) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' First Request for Admission, #2 State Court Record (Plaintiff's Complaint, Certificate of Issuance of Summons to Defendant Cardinal Express LLC, Appearance by Attorneys in Civil Case for Plaintiff, Summons to Mohamed Moalim, Summons to Cardinal Express, Jury Trial Demand, Motion for Enlargement of Time, Appearance by Attorney in Civil Case of Christopher R. Whitten and James L. Culp, Order on Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time, Alias Summons to Defendant Cardinal Express LLC, Certificate of Issuance of Summons to Defendant, Cardinal Express LLC and Proof of Service of Summons on Defendant Cardinal Express LLC), #3 Exhibit C-Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Exhibit D-State Court Record, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitten, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHLAGEL v. MOALIM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL EXPRESS, LLC
Represented By: James L. Culp
Represented By: Christopher R. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOHAMED MOALIM
Represented By: James L. Culp
Represented By: Christopher R. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILDRED SCHLAGEL
Represented By: Alexander Ryan Craig
Represented By: David W. Craig
Represented By: William J. Kelley
Represented By: Scott Anthony Faultless
Represented By: Whitney Lee Coker
Represented By: Samantha C. Craig Stevens
Represented By: Christopher M. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?