SMITH v. ZATECKY

Petitioner: DOUGLAS A. SMITH
Respondent: DUSHAN ZATECKY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00654
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 Respondent's Notice of 42-day Extension of Deadline to File a Return to Order Show Cause, filed by DUSHAN ZATECKY. Return to Order to Show Cause deadline is 5/10/2019. (Recker, Abigail)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David Corey on behalf of Respondent DUSHAN ZATECKY. (Corey, David)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 RECEIPT #IP064371 for filing fee in the amount of $5.00, paid by Petitioner. (DJH)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Disciplinary) - The custodian of petitioner is directed to answer the allegations of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 3/29/2019.. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 2/15/2019. Copy Mailed (CKM)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DOUGLAS A. SMITH. (No fee paid with this filing) (REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. ZATECKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DUSHAN ZATECKY
Represented By: David Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DOUGLAS A. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?