SIMS v. LAYTON et al
Plaintiff: JOHN SIMS
Defendant: JOHN R. LAYTON, TERESA PIERCE, GACHAW, COURTNEY KROES, MEGAN ANDREWS, ALICIA JACKSON, MELISSA RIGNEY and SYDNEY SOUCEK
Case Number: 1:2019cv00700
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 Resent dkt. 7 to John Sims at WVCF per Notice of Change of Address filed on 04/05/2019. (MEH)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as undeliverable - RTS/attempted/unable to forward. #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis sent to JOHN SIMS - 232623 NEW CASTLE CORRECTIONAL FACILITY - Inmate Mail/Parcels 1000 Van Nuys Road NEW CASTLE, IN 47362 (DWH)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address for JOHN SIMS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (DWH)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 Submission of additional Trust Fund Account Information, filed by Plaintiff JOHN SIMS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY GRANTING MOTIONS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - The plaintiff's motions to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #4 and dkt. #6 , are granted. The assessment of even an initial partial filing fee is waived because the plaintiff has insufficient assets and means by which to pay a partial filing fee (SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 3/18/2019. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION (Letter) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JOHN SIMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certification of Inmate Trust Fund Account, #2 Exhibit 2 - Transaction History Report, #3 Envelope)(DWH)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by JOHN SIMS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION (Certificate of Inmate Trust Fund Account) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JOHN SIMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Transaction History Report, #2 Envelope)(DWH)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - The plaintiff shall have through March 25, 2019, in which to either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that he lacks the financial ability to do so. If he seeks leave to proceed in forma pauperis, his request must be accompanied by a copy of the transactions associated with his institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action on February 15, 2019. Failure to comply with this Order may subject the case to dismissal for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with Court orders. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 2/22/2019. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MEGAN ANDREWS, GACHAW, ALICIA JACKSON, COURTNEY KROES, JOHN R. LAYTON, TERESA PIERCE, MELISSA RIGNEY, SYDNEY SOUCEK, filed by JOHN SIMS. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Envelope)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIMS v. LAYTON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN R. LAYTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERESA PIERCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GACHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COURTNEY KROES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEGAN ANDREWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALICIA JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA RIGNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYDNEY SOUCEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN SIMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?