MCCLAINE v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: CORINA MCCLAINE
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00745
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by counsel for an Initial Pretrial Conference on April 17, 2019. The Court will approve the Case Management Plan, by separate order, with the changes to which the parties have agreed. This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on August 1, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. (Eastern) to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. In addition, this matter is scheduled for a settlement conference on October 28, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern), in Room 255, United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana, before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY and Plaintiff Corina McClaine. (Drummy, John)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sua sponte now RESCHEDULES the telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for April 11, 2019 to April 17, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Eastern). Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/9/2019.(SWM)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by William David Beyers on behalf of Plaintiff CORINA MCCLAINE. (Beyers, William)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 9:30 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 2/25/2019.(CBU)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Removal Notice in the Boone Superior Court by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Plaintiff and Clerk of Boone County Superior Court of Defendant's Removal of Action to Federal Court) (Drummy, John)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Drummy, John)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Drummy, John)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Nicole Guthrie on behalf of Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Guthrie, Jennifer)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Drummy on behalf of Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Drummy, John)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boone Superior Court 1, case number 06D01-1808-PL-001151, filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5293045) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Appearance, Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, Summons, Certified Mail, Appearance, Motion for Enlargement of Time, Order for Enlargement of Time, Motion for Default Judgment Against Witham Hospital, Motion for Partial Dismissals of CIGNA Healthcare of Indiana, Inc., Appearance, Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time, Order Granting Partial Dismissal of CIGNA Healthcare of Indiana, Inc., Order, Order, Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Request for Jury Trial, Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses, Motion for Partial Dismissal of Board of Trustees of the Flavius J. Witham Memorial Hospital, Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions, Order Granting Partial Dismissal of Board of Trustees of the Flavius J. Witham Memorial Hospital, Motion to Amend Complaint, Amended Complaint, Amended Complaint, Appearance, Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance, Order Granting Withdrawal, Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint, Amended Complaint, #2 Appendix Email string of September 4, 2018, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drummy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCLAINE v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: John B. Drummy
Represented By: Jennifer Nicole Guthrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORINA MCCLAINE
Represented By: William David Beyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?