TOOLEY v. SECOND EMERSON COMMONS WAY, LLC

Plaintiff: DENNIS TOOLEY
Defendant: SECOND EMERSON COMMONS WAY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00755
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2019 02:30 PM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/16/2019.(SWM)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by SECOND EMERSON COMMONS WAY, LLC.(Bishop, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Bishop on behalf of Defendant SECOND EMERSON COMMONS WAY, LLC. (Bishop, John)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant SECOND EMERSON COMMONS WAY, LLC. (Bishop, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SECOND EMERSON COMMONS WAY, LLC. (Bishop, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Paul Bishop on behalf of Defendant SECOND EMERSON COMMONS WAY, LLC. (Bishop, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by DENNIS TOOLEY. SECOND EMERSON COMMONS WAY, LLC served on 2/28/2019. (Mussman, Louis Ivan)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SECOND EMERSON COMMONS WAY, LLC. (REO)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric C. Bohnet on behalf of Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY. (Bohnet, Eric)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Ivan Christopher Mussman on behalf of Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY. (Mussman, Louis Ivan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SECOND EMERSON COMMONS WAY, LLC, filed by DENNIS TOOLEY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5295960) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Mussman, Louis Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOOLEY v. SECOND EMERSON COMMONS WAY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS TOOLEY
Represented By: Louis Ivan Christopher Mussman
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECOND EMERSON COMMONS WAY, LLC
Represented By: Michael Paul Bishop
Represented By: John B. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?