OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY v. SNODGRASS et al
Plaintiff: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: ELIZABETH SORG, A/K/A ELISABETH SORG, GREGORY SHRIVER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NATURAL PARENTS AND LEGAL GUARDIANS OF EMILY R. SHRIVER, THEIR MINOR NATURAL CHILD, CITY OF GREENWOOD, BRADFORD SNODGRASS, ELISABETH SORG and GREGORY SHRIVER
Case Number: 1:2019cv00771
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY . (Lansberry, Kyle)
April 15, 2019 Filing 35 DEFENDANT CITY OF GREENWOOD'S ANSWER to Complaint AMENDED FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, filed by CITY OF GREENWOOD.(Wong, Kyle)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Seal Document 26 Notice of Appearance, 25 Motion for Extension of Time, 24 Notice of Appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/28/2019. (CBU)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Stephen P. Hall for OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/28/2019 (dist made) (CBU)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to 4/25/2019 for the Defendants, Elizabeth Sorg, Gregory Shriver, Individually and as Natural Parents and Legal Guardians of ERS, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/28/2019. (CBU)
March 26, 2019 Filing 31 REDACTION to 26 Notice of Appearance by GREGORY SHRIVER, ELIZABETH SORG. (Hamilton, Jeanne)
March 26, 2019 Filing 30 REDACTION to 25 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Declaratory Action by GREGORY SHRIVER, ELIZABETH SORG. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Graziano, Sarah)
March 26, 2019 Filing 29 REDACTION to 24 Notice of Appearance by GREGORY SHRIVER, ELIZABETH SORG. (Graziano, Sarah)
March 26, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal 26 Notice of Appearance, 25 Motion for Extension of Time, 24 Notice of Appearance , filed by Defendants GREGORY SHRIVER, ELIZABETH SORG. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Order)(Graziano, Sarah)
March 26, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen P. Hall to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5351870), filed by Plaintiff OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Exhibit Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Lansberry, Kyle)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting Defendant Snodgrass's #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint to 5/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/15/2019. (MAC)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2019 at 2:00 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/13/2019.(CBU)
March 12, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant CITY OF GREENWOOD. (Drummy, John)
March 12, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Blake Wong on behalf of Defendant CITY OF GREENWOOD. (Wong, Kyle)
March 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Drummy on behalf of Defendant CITY OF GREENWOOD. (Drummy, John)
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 Submission of Signature Requirement re #17 Notice (Other) by BRADFORD SNODGRASS. (Meyer, Tammy)
March 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance of Aryeh Avnet, filed by Defendant BRADFORD SNODGRASS (Meyer, Tammy) Modified on 3/8/2019 (CKM). Modified on 3/8/2019 (CKM).
March 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to May 16, 2019 to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Declaratory Relief, filed by Defendant BRADFORD SNODGRASS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion for Extension of Time)(Meyer, Tammy)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Tammy Jo Meyer on behalf of Defendant BRADFORD SNODGRASS. (Meyer, Tammy)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Seal Documents [1-5]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 2/28/2019. (CBU)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to CITY OF GREENWOOD, GREGORY SHRIVER, BRADFORD SNODGRASS, ELIZABETH SORG. (CKM)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 REDACTION to #5 Notice of Appearance by OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY. (Giordano, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 REDACTION to #4 Summons (proposed) by OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY. (Giordano, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 REDACTION to #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY. (Giordano, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 REDACTION Appearance by OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY. (Giordano, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 REDACTION to #1 Complaint for Declaratory Relief by OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY. (Giordano, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Summons (proposed), #5 Notice of Appearance , filed by Plaintiff OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Seal)(Giordano, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 ***SEALED PER ORDER OF 2/28/2019***NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Andrew Lansberry on behalf of Plaintiff OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY. (Lansberry, Kyle) Modified on 2/28/2019 (CBU).
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 ***SEALED PER ORDER OF 2/28/2019***Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY. (Giordano, Michael) Modified on 2/28/2019 (CBU).
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 ***SEALED PER ORDER OF 2/28/2019***Corporate Disclosure Statement by OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY. (Giordano, Michael) Modified on 2/28/2019 (CBU).
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 ***SEALED PER ORDER OF 2/28/2019***NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Robert Giordano on behalf of Plaintiff OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY. (Giordano, Michael) Modified on 2/28/2019 (CBU).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 ***SEALED PER ORDER OF 2/28/2019***COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5299399) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giordano, Michael) Modified on 2/25/2019 (CKM). Modified on 2/28/2019 (CBU).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY v. SNODGRASS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH SORG
Represented By: Sarah Jane Graziano
Represented By: Jeanne M. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A/K/A ELISABETH SORG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY SHRIVER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NATURAL PARENTS AND LEGAL GUARDIANS OF EMILY R. SHRIVER, THEIR MINOR NATURAL CHILD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF GREENWOOD
Represented By: Kyle Blake Wong
Represented By: John B. Drummy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRADFORD SNODGRASS
Represented By: Tammy Jo Meyer
Represented By: Aryeh Avnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELISABETH SORG
Represented By: Sarah Jane Graziano
Represented By: Jeanne M. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY SHRIVER
Represented By: Sarah Jane Graziano
Represented By: Jeanne M. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Michael Robert Giordano
Represented By: Kyle Andrew Lansberry
Represented By: Stephen P. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?