HORN, et al. v. HOME RUN, INC., et al

Plaintiff: Tyler Horn, Chrsitina Horn and CHRISTINA HORN
Defendant: Home Run, Inc. and Randy Turner
Case Number: 1:2019cv00792
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Defendants HOME RUN, INC., RANDY TURNER. (Kuck, Marie)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 9/6/2019. Discovery due by 2/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 4/11/2019.(SWM)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/11/2019. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended, to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/10/2019 at 2:30 PM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 4/11/2019.(SWM)
April 11, 2019 Filing 17 Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiffs CHRISTINA HORN, TYLER HORN, Witness List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiffs CHRISTINA HORN, TYLER HORN. (Craig, Alexander)
April 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Plaintiffs CHRISTINA HORN, TYLER HORN. (Craig, Alexander)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Ryan Craig on behalf of Plaintiffs CHRISTINA HORN, TYLER HORN. (Craig, Alexander)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Barry on behalf of Plaintiffs CHRISTINA HORN, TYLER HORN. (Barry, Christopher)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Craig on behalf of Plaintiffs CHRISTINA HORN, TYLER HORN. (Craig, David)
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE , re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiffs CHRISTINA HORN, TYLER HORN. (Faultless, Scott)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Anthony Faultless on behalf of Plaintiffs CHRISTINA HORN, TYLER HORN. (Faultless, Scott)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants HOME RUN, INC., RANDY TURNER . (Kuck, Marie)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , filed by HOME RUN, INC., RANDY TURNER.(Roehrdanz, James)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 2:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference in the format set forth in the model CMP found on the Court's website (www.insd.uscourts.gov). Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines as set forth. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/27/2019. (GD)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOME RUN, INC.. (Kuck, Marie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to HOME RUN, INC. (LAB) (JDH)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James William Roehrdanz on behalf of Defendants Home Run, Inc., Randy Turner. (Roehrdanz, James)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior, case number 49D07-1901-CT-003286, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5300711) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Notice to Plaintiffs and Clerk of Marion County Superior Court, #3 State Court Record Docket, Appearance, Summons, Complaint, Defendant's Counsel's Appearance, Automatic Notice of Enlargement, Order Granting Enlargement, #4 Exhibit Complaint)(Kuck, Marie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HORN, et al. v. HOME RUN, INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Horn
Represented By: Alexander Ryan Craig
Represented By: David W. Craig
Represented By: William J. Kelley
Represented By: Scott Anthony Faultless
Represented By: Whitney Lee Coker
Represented By: Samantha C. Craig Stevens
Represented By: Christopher M. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrsitina Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA HORN
Represented By: Alexander Ryan Craig
Represented By: David W. Craig
Represented By: William J. Kelley
Represented By: Scott Anthony Faultless
Represented By: Whitney Lee Coker
Represented By: Samantha C. Craig Stevens
Represented By: Christopher M. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Run, Inc.
Represented By: James William Roehrdanz
Represented By: Marie Alexander Kuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Turner
Represented By: James William Roehrdanz
Represented By: Marie Alexander Kuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?