BELL v. CLASSIC TOUCH LIMOUSINE SERVICE INC
Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Defendant: CLASSIC TOUCH LIMOUSINE SERVICE INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00803
Filed: February 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default against CLASSIC TOUCH LIMOUSINE SERVICE INC, filed by Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Bell, Richard)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. (Bell, Richard)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. CLASSIC TOUCH LIMOUSINE SERVICE INC served on 3/8/2019. (Bell, Richard)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to CLASSIC TOUCH LIMOUSINE SERVICE INC. (DWH)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to RICHARD N. BELL. (Bell, Richard)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CLASSIC TOUCH LIMOUSINE SERVICE INC. (HET)
February 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard N. Bell on behalf of Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Bell, Richard)
February 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CLASSIC TOUCH LIMOUSINE SERVICE INC, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5301488) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Copyrighted Indianapolis Photo, #2 Exhibit B*Copy of Infringement by Defendant, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Bell, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELL v. CLASSIC TOUCH LIMOUSINE SERVICE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Represented By: Richard N. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLASSIC TOUCH LIMOUSINE SERVICE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?