FISH v. SPEEDWAY LLC
Plaintiff: AMANDA FISH
Defendant: SPEEDWAY LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00833
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 19 Witness List , filed by Plaintiff AMANDA FISH. (Czernik, Christopher)
April 12, 2019 Filing 18 Exhibit List , filed by Plaintiff AMANDA FISH. (Czernik, Christopher)
April 11, 2019 Filing 17 Witness List (Preliminary), filed by Defendant SPEEDWAY LLC, Exhibit List (Preliminary), filed by Defendant SPEEDWAY LLC. (Davis, Thomas)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER- Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2020 at 3:30 PM (Eastern) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Jury Trial set for 5/19/2020 at 9:00 AM (Eastern) in room #243, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 4/3/2019.(CBU)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REFERENCE - The parties have consented to the exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge. Dkt. #14 . This case is, therefore, REFERRED to the current ly assigned United States Magistrate Judge, The Honorable Mark J. Dinsmore, to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. If this case is reassigned to a different magistrate judge, any attorney or party of record may object within 30 days of that reassignment. If no objection is filed, the consent will remain in effect. This action's case number SHALL be amended as shown above to reflect this referral to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 4/2/2019.(DWH)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions are not contemplated. Discovery due by 2/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/21/2019.(SWM)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/21/2019. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended, to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/12/2019 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/21/2019.(SWM)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant SPEEDWAY LLC . (Davis, Thomas)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defendant's #9 Motion for Continuance. Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 3/21/2019 03:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan on or before March 19, 2019. All other requirements of the Court's Scheduling Order dated February 27, 2019 [Dkt. #6 ] remain in effect, and the teleconference call-in information issued by the Court on March 11, 2019 [Dkt. 8 ] remains unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/12/2019.(SWM)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Conference, filed by Defendant SPEEDWAY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Continue Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference)(Davis, Thomas)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 Submission of additional State Court Records. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2019 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") on or before March 13, 2019. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/27/2019.(SWM)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal by SPEEDWAY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Filing Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Record : Order for Case Management Conference dated February 19, 2019; Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Appearance (Thomas L. Davis); Summons; Complaint for Damages, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Thomas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPEEDWAY LLC identifying Corporate Parent MARATHON PETROLEUM CORPORATION, Other Affiliate MPC INVESTMENT LLC for SPEEDWAY LLC.. (Davis, Thomas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Davis on behalf of Defendant SPEEDWAY LLC. (Davis, Thomas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court, case number 49D10-1901-CT-001535, filed by SPEEDWAY LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5305162) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint for Damages, #2 State Court Record : Order for Case Management Conference dated February 19, 2019; Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Appearance (Thomas L. Davis); Summons; Complaint for Damages, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FISH v. SPEEDWAY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEEDWAY LLC
Represented By: Thomas L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA FISH
Represented By: Christopher L. Czernik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?