BELL v. CALEY et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Defendant: MARYCO CLEANING SERVICE, INC. and CHRISTY JOY CALEY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00879
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by MARYCO CLEANING SERVICE, INC..(Cody, Christopher)
April 15, 2019 Filing 14 Submission of Waiver of the Service of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDC)
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Steven Caley to Christy Joy Caley (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JDC)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE Of Appearance filed by Steven Caley on behalf of Christy Joy Caley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JDC)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. (Bell, Richard)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Complaint to 4/26/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/29/2019. (JRB)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/26/2019 , filed by Defendant MARYCO CLEANING SERVICE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cody, Christopher)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Douglas Cody on behalf of Defendant MARYCO CLEANING SERVICE, INC.. (Cody, Christopher)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. CHRISTY JOY CALEY served on 3/8/2019; MARYCO CLEANING SERVICE, INC. served on 3/8/2019. (Bell, Richard)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (JDC)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CHRISTY JOY CALEY and MARYCO CLEANING SERVICE, INC. (DJH)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard N. Bell on behalf of Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Bell, Richard)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5312391) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-INDIANAPOLIS NIGHT TIME PHOTO, #2 Exhibit B-INFRINGEMENT BY DEFENDANTS, #3 Exhibit C-Wayback Machine Maryco 3-18-2013, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Bell, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELL v. CALEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Represented By: Richard N. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARYCO CLEANING SERVICE, INC.
Represented By: Christopher Douglas Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTY JOY CALEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?