SCROUGHAMS et al v. PSS TRUCKING, INC. et al

Plaintiff: BILLY SCROUGHAMS and KIMBERLY SCROUGHAMS
Defendant: PSS TRUCKING, INC., CARTER TRANSPORT SERVICES, C ANDRE CARTER, NIRMAL SINGH and C. ANDRE CARTER
Case Number: 1:2019cv00937
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Outstanding Discovery Responses (Certified), filed by Defendants PSS TRUCKING, INC., NIRMAL SINGH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - written inquiries from Defendants' counsel re outstanding discovery responses, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - email from Pltfs' counsel representing when discovery responses would be sent, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - emails from Defendants' counsel re delay in providing discovery responses, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - email from Defendants' counsel re will file motion to compel, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Compel)(Hoy, Jason)
May 2, 2019 Filing 22 Witness List (Preliminary), filed by Defendants C. ANDRE CARTER, CARTER TRANSPORT SERVICES, Exhibit List (Preliminary), filed by Defendants C. ANDRE CARTER, CARTER TRANSPORT SERVICES. (Danielson, Melissa)
May 2, 2019 Filing 21 Witness List , filed by Defendants PSS TRUCKING, INC., NIRMAL SINGH, Exhibit List , filed by Defendants PSS TRUCKING, INC., NIRMAL SINGH. (Hoy, Jason)
April 30, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin N. Weiser on behalf of Counter Defendant BILLY SCROUGHAMS. (Weiser, Martin)
April 25, 2019 Filing 19 Witness List Plaintiffs' Preliminary Witness & Exhibit List, filed by Plaintiffs BILLY SCROUGHAMS, KIMBERLY SCROUGHAMS. (Ely, Carolyn)
April 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Plaintiffs BILLY SCROUGHAMS, KIMBERLY SCROUGHAMS. (Ely, Carolyn)
April 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Defendants PSS TRUCKING, INC., NIRMAL SINGH. (Hoy, Jason)
April 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Defendants C. ANDRE CARTER, CARTER TRANSPORT SERVICES. (Danielson, Melissa)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Regarding Protective Orders (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 4/12/2019. (MAC)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Discovery due by 5/22/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 9/13/2019. (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 4/12/2019. (MAC)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/12/2019. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended, to be issued by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/10/2019 at 3:00 PM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants PSS TRUCKING, INC., NIRMAL SINGH . (Hoy, Jason)
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn C. Ely on behalf of Plaintiffs BILLY SCROUGHAMS, KIMBERLY SCROUGHAMS. (Ely, Carolyn)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2019 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) on or before April 10, 2019 in the format set forth in the model CMP found on the Court's website (www.insd.uscourts.gov). Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines as set forth. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/22/2019. (GD)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Bryce Zoeller on behalf of Defendants C ANDRE CARTER, CARTER TRANSPORT SERVICES. (Zoeller, D.)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CARTER TRANSPORT SERVICES. (Danielson, Melissa)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Forcum Danielson on behalf of Defendants C ANDRE CARTER, CARTER TRANSPORT SERVICES. (Danielson, Melissa)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PSS TRUCKING, INC.. (Hoy, Jason)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason J. Hoy on behalf of Defendants PSS TRUCKING, INC., NIRMAL SINGH. (Hoy, Jason)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Whitten on behalf of Defendants PSS TRUCKING, INC., NIRMAL SINGH. (Whitten, Christopher)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hancock Superior Court, case number 30D01-1812-CT-002293, filed by NIRMAL SINGH, PSS TRUCKING, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5320085) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pltfs' Response to First Requests for Admission, #2 State Court Record (Appearance for Pltfs, Pltfs' Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, Summons to PSS Trucking, Summons to Singh, Summons to Carter Transport, Summons to Carter, Appearance for Defs Carter Transport and Carter, Defs Carter Transport and Carter's Motion for Initial Enlargement of Time, Order Granting Defs Carter Transport and Carter's Motion for Initial Enlargement of Time, Appearance for Defs PSS Trucking and Singh, Defs PSS Trucking and Singh's Motion for Enlargement of Time, Order Granting Defs PSS Trucking and Singh's Motion for Enlargement of Time, Defs PSS Trucking and Singh's Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Trial by Jury, Defs Carter Transport and Carter Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaim for Property Damages, and Request for Jury Trial, #3 Exhibit Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hoy, Jason) Modified on 3/7/2019 (removed duplicate docket text -- Attach 4 only) (DJH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCROUGHAMS et al v. PSS TRUCKING, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSS TRUCKING, INC.
Represented By: Jason J. Hoy
Represented By: Christopher R. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARTER TRANSPORT SERVICES
Represented By: D. Bryce Zoeller
Represented By: Melissa Forcum Danielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C ANDRE CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIRMAL SINGH
Represented By: Jason J. Hoy
Represented By: Christopher R. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. ANDRE CARTER
Represented By: D. Bryce Zoeller
Represented By: Melissa Forcum Danielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLY SCROUGHAMS
Represented By: Carolyn C. Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY SCROUGHAMS
Represented By: Carolyn C. Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?