CARLSON v. IVY TECH COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF INDIANA

Plaintiff: LEE T CARLSON and LEE T. CARLSON
Defendant: IVY TECH COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF INDIANA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01104
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by IVY TECH COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF INDIANA.(Ritsema, Cameron)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Dean Ritsema on behalf of Defendant IVY TECH COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF INDIANA. (Ritsema, Cameron)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IVY TECH COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF INDIANA. (Ritsema, Cameron)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant IVY TECH COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF INDIANA. (Ritsema, Cameron)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul H. Sinclair on behalf of Defendant IVY TECH COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF INDIANA. (Sinclair, Paul)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against LEE T. CARLSON, filed by LEE T. CARLSON.(Meisenhelder, Jay) Modified on 3/21/2019 (JRB).
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to IVY TECH COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF INDIANA. (JRB)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Meisenhelder on behalf of Plaintiff LEE T CARLSON. (Meisenhelder, Jay)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against IVY TECH COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF INDIANA, filed by LEE T CARLSON. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5342243) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Meisenhelder, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARLSON v. IVY TECH COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEE T CARLSON
Represented By: Jay Meisenhelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEE T. CARLSON
Represented By: Jay Meisenhelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVY TECH COMMUNITY COLLEGE OF INDIANA
Represented By: Paul H. Sinclair
Represented By: Cameron Dean Ritsema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?