HALSTEAD v. SAUL

Plaintiff: JOHN W. HALSTEAD
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL and ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 1:2019cv01129
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - This cause is before the Court on Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time. The Court, being duly advised, now GRANTS Defendant's motion. Accordingly, Defendant is granted an enlargement of time, until August 12, 2019, to file his response to Plaintiff's brief. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 7/10/2019. (JDH)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to August 12, 2019 , filed by Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Han, Lu)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lu Han on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Han, Lu)
June 16, 2019 Filing 7 Brief in Support of Complaint for Review by JOHN W. HALSTEAD. (Wold, Kirsten)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Plaintiff seeks judicial review of the defendant Commissioner's denial of Plaintiff's claim for Social Security benefits based on disability. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16, the Court now enters the orders contained herein. See Order for details regarding Briefing Schedule, Conference of Counsel, Requirements for Opening Briefs, and Citations to the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/20/2019.(JDH)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record of Social Security Administration, by NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Attachments: #1 court transcript index, #2 administrative documents, #3 payment documents, #4 jurisdictional documents, #5 non disability related documents, #6 disability related documents, #7 medical records part 1, #8 medical records part 2, #9 medical records part 3, #10 medical records part 4, #11 medical records part 5, #12 medical records part 6, #13 medical records part 7)(Wierenga, Julian)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Wierenga, Julian)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten Elaine Wold on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN W. HALSTEAD. (Wold, Kirsten)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by JOHN W. HALSTEAD. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5345003) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wold, Kirsten)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HALSTEAD v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN W. HALSTEAD
Represented By: Kirsten Elaine Wold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Represented By: Lu Han
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?