OOTEN v. SPEEDWAY, LLC
Plaintiff: HEATHER OOTEN
Defendant: SPEEDWAY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01232
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS SUBMITTED. Parties appeared by counsel on 5/9/2019, for an Initial Pretrial Conference. Dispositive Motions not contemplated. Discovery due by 5/22/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2020 01:30 PM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Jury Trial set for 8/25/2020 09:30 AM in room #238, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 5/21/2019.(SWM)
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 Witness List (Preliminary), filed by Defendant SPEEDWAY, LLC, Exhibit List (Preliminary), filed by Defendant SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Davis, Thomas)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 Exhibit List Plaintiff's Initial Exhibit List, filed by Plaintiff HEATHER OOTEN. (Hurt, James)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 Witness List Plaintiff's Initial Witness List, filed by Plaintiff HEATHER OOTEN. (Hurt, James)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant SPEEDWAY, LLC . (Davis, Thomas)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2019 01:30 PM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/12/2019.(SWM)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERENCE -The parties have indicated their consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge by the filing of a joint consent [Dkt. 6]. It is, therefore, ORDERED, that this case be referred to the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge, The Honorable Tim A. Baker, to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Should this case be reassigned to a magistrate judge other than the magistrate judge assigned the date of this order, any attorney or party of record may object within 30 days of such reassignment. If no objection is filed, the consent will remain in effect. The cause number of this action shall be amended as shown above to reflect the referral of this action to the Magistrate Judge. Please use altered case no. 1:19-cv-01232-TAB-SEB on all future filings with this court. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 4/8/2019. (CKM)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Davis, Thomas)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal by SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Filing Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Record : Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Appearance by Attorney in Civil Case (Thomas L. Davis); Summons; Complaint for Damages, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Thomas)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPEEDWAY, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MARATHON PETROLEUM CORPORATION, Other Affiliate MPC INVESTMENT LLC for SPEEDWAY, LLC.. (Davis, Thomas)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Davis on behalf of Defendant SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Davis, Thomas)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court, case number 49D04-1902-CT-006543, filed by SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5354088) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint for Damages, #2 State Court Record : Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Appearance by Attorney in Civil Case (Thomas L. Davis); Summons; Complaint for Damages, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OOTEN v. SPEEDWAY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEEDWAY, LLC
Represented By: Thomas L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER OOTEN
Represented By: James R Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?