ELI LILLY AND COMPANY v. DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. et al
Plaintiff: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. and DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01246
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Final Determination in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Order dated 05/08/2019 closing case) (JDH)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY, ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE THE CASE, AND BE BOUND - Upon consideration of the Joint Motion to Stay, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Joint Motion #16 is GRANTED; 2. The parties shall be BOUND by the Court's final judgment in Eli Lilly and Company v. Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., No. 1:16-cv-308-TWP-MPB (S.D. Ind.), in accordance with the terms and conditions set forth in the Joint Motion; and 3. The above-captioned action is hereby STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending the outcome of Eli Lilly and Company v. Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., No. 18-2128 (Fed. Cir.), including any proceedings on remand and appeals therefrom, in accordance with the terms and conditions set forth in the Joint Motion; and 4. Within 14 days of the issuance of the mandate in Eli Lilly and Company v. Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., No. 18-2128 (Fed. Cir.), the parties are directed to confer, prepare, and file jointly a status report or otherwise apprise the Court of whether a continued stay is appropriate. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/8/2019.(JDH)
May 7, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Stay , Administratively Close the Case, and Be Bound, filed by Plaintiff ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fomenkova, Galina)
April 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Dov P. Grossman on behalf of Plaintiff ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Grossman, Dov)
April 12, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. (MAC)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiff ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 7,772,209) (JDH) Modified on 4/1/2019 (JDH). (Main Document 12 replaced on 4/1/2019) (JDH).
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Lemens on behalf of Plaintiff ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Lemens, Andrew)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Galina I. Fomenkova on behalf of Plaintiff ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Fomenkova, Galina)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Krinsky on behalf of Plaintiff ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Krinsky, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam L. Perlman on behalf of Plaintiff ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Perlman, Adam)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD.. (Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Cases, filed by Plaintiff ELI LILLY AND COMPANY (Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Pollack-Milgate on behalf of Plaintiff ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD., filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5356021) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 7,772,209)(Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY v. DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Represented By: Galina I. Fomenkova
Represented By: Andrew Lemens
Represented By: Deborah Pollack-Milgate
Represented By: Adam L. Perlman
Represented By: David M. Krinsky
Represented By: Dov P. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?