BELL v. CYSTIC FIBROSIS FOUNDATION

Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Defendant: CYSTIC FIBROSIS FOUNDATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01285
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 CLOSED DISMISSED with prejudice. This case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 6/25/2019 (dist made)(CBU)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bell, Richard)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. CYSTIC FIBROSIS FOUNDATION waiver sent on 3/29/2019. (Bell, Richard)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Exhibits) (CKM)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CYSTIC FIBROSIS FOUNDATION. (REO)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard N. Bell on behalf of Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Bell, Richard)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CYSTIC FIBROSIS FOUNDATION, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5360167) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-COPYRIGHTED INDIANAPOLIS PHOTO, #2 Exhibit B-COPY OF INFRINGEMENT BY DEFENDANT, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Bell, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELL v. CYSTIC FIBROSIS FOUNDATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Represented By: Richard N. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYSTIC FIBROSIS FOUNDATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?