BELL v. THE RAINMAKER GROUP - RENT JUNGLE LLC

Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Defendant: THE RAINMAKER GROUP RENT JUNGLE LLC and THE RAINMAKER GROUP - RENT JUNGLE LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01326
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #10 Report - Copyright (AO Form 121) sent to sent to U.S. Copyright Office at 101 Independence Ave. S.E.. Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (NAD)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 Re-mailed to the U.S. Copyright Office re #10 NOTICE of Final Determination in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: # 1 Order on Unopposed Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice as to Defendant The Rainmaker Group - Rent Jungle LLC) (NAD) (NAD)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned as undeliverable (Return to Sender; Not Deliverable as Addressed). #10 Report - Copyright (AO Form 121) sent to U.S. Copyright Office at 101 Independence Ave. S.E.. Washington, D.C. 20559-6000 (NAD)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Final Determination in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Order on Unopposed Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice as to Defendant The Rainmaker Group - Rent Jungle LLC) (NAD)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT THE RAINMAKER GROUP - RENT JUNGLE LLC - The Plaintiff having filed a DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF THE RAINMAKER GROUP - RENT JUNGLE LLC, which is not opposed by the Defendant, the Court finds this Motion should be granted. This Court Orders that the case be Dismissed against THE RAINMAKER GROUP - RENT JUNGLE LLC with prejudice. This case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 5/20/2019.(NAD)
May 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bell, Richard)
May 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bell, Richard)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. THE RAINMAKER GROUP - RENT JUNGLE LLC waiver sent on 4/3/2019. (Bell, Richard)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-COPYRIGHTED INDIANAPOLIS PHOTO, #2 Exhibit B-COPY INFRINGEMENT BY DEFENDANT) (NAD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2019: #3 Complaint) (NAD).
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to THE RAINMAKER GROUP - RENT JUNGLE LLC. (REO)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard N. Bell on behalf of Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Bell, Richard)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE RAINMAKER GROUP RENT JUNGLE LLC, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5363569) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-COPYRIGHTED INDIANAPOLIS PHOTO, #2 Exhibit B-COPY INFRINGEMENT BY DEFENDANT, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Bell, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELL v. THE RAINMAKER GROUP - RENT JUNGLE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Represented By: Richard N. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE RAINMAKER GROUP RENT JUNGLE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE RAINMAKER GROUP - RENT JUNGLE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?