WILHELM v. PILKINTON NORTH AMERICA, INC. RETRIEE HEALTH CARE PLAN et al

Plaintiff: PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC. and STEPHEN WILHELM
Defendant: PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC. RETIREE HEALTH CARE PLAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv01332
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference and Related Deadlines: Settlement Conference set for 9/25/2019 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. On or before three (3) business days before the conference, the parties shall submit (not file) a confidential settlement statement. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/20/2019.(SWM)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Entry from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on June 13, 2019, with the magistrate judge. The court will not enter a case management order at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS) Modified on 6/14/2019 (JLS).
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #17 Motion for Continuance. Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 6/13/2019 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. All other provisions of the Court's scheduling order (Dkt. #13 ) remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/28/2019.(SWM)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Conference, filed by Plaintiff STEPHEN WILHELM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Ryan)
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Karwath, Bart)
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC., PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC. RETIREE HEALTH CARE PLAN, filed by STEPHEN WILHELM.(Sullivan, Ryan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by STEPHEN WILHELM. PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC. RETIREE HEALTH CARE PLAN served on 4/22/2019. (Sullivan, Ryan) Modified on 5/3/2019 - Edited text to remove Return of USM Service (NAD).
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2019 11:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/25/2019.(SWM)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Defendants' #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 5/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/24/2019. (SWM)
April 23, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited, Corporate Parent Pilkington Holdings, Inc. for PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC... (Karwath, Bart)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to may 31, 2019 to respond to complaint, filed by Defendants PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC., PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC. RETIREE HEALTH CARE PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Karwath, Bart)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bart A. Karwath on behalf of Defendants PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC., PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC. RETIREE HEALTH CARE PLAN. (Karwath, Bart)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by STEPHEN WILHELM. PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC. served on 4/12/2019. (Sullivan, Ryan)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC., PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC. RETIREE HEALTH CARE PLAN. (NAD)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC., PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC. RETIREE HEALTH CARE PLAN. (Sullivan, Ryan)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC. (REO)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Dutkanych, III on behalf of Plaintiff STEPHEN WILHELM. (Dutkanych, Andrew)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan William Sullivan on behalf of Plaintiff STEPHEN WILHELM. (Sullivan, Ryan)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC., PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC. RETIREE HEALTH CARE PLAN, filed by STEPHEN WILHELM. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5365846) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Sullivan, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILHELM v. PILKINTON NORTH AMERICA, INC. RETRIEE HEALTH CARE PLAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN WILHELM
Represented By: Andrew Dutkanych, III
Represented By: Ryan William Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PILKINGTON NORTH AMERICA, INC. RETIREE HEALTH CARE PLAN
Represented By: Bart A. Karwath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?