OWENS v. EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY OWENS
Defendant: EMPLOYBRIDGE, EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC. and EMPLOYBRIDGE MIDWEST
Case Number: 1:2019cv01351
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the Parties' Joint Motion to Stay Judicial Proceedings. Having considered this matter fully, and the Court being otherwise sufficiently advised, IT IS ORDERED that the Parties' Joint Motion to Stay Judicial Proceedings is GRANTED and this matter is held in abeyance pending the arbitration of this matter. The Court terminates all pending motions and the parties are granted leave to refile any terminated motion, in the event arbitration is unsuccessful. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 6/13/2019.(NAD)
June 12, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Stay Judicial Proceedings, filed by Defendant EMPLOYBRIDGE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Litzinger, Emily)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - granting #20 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Eric J Hartz withdrawn. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 6/5/2019. (NAD)
May 31, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance , filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY OWENS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartz, Eric)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Stay of Proceedings as to Defendant Expeditors International of Washington, Inc. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that all proceedings in this matter are stayed and all deadlines are mooted as to Defendant EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC., ONLY, pending outcome of arbitration between the parties. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are DIRECTED to file a Report with the court upon setting the date for arbitration, and file a Status Report within thirty (30) days after completion of arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 5/29/2019. (TMB)
May 24, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay of Proceedings as to Defendant Expeditors International of Washington, Inc., filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY OWENS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Bradley)
May 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Mark Adams on behalf of Plaintiff ANTHONY OWENS. (Adams, Samuel)
May 22, 2019 Filing 16 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - INCORRECT FILING***NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Mark Adams on behalf of Plaintiff ANTHONY OWENS. (Adams, Samuel) Modified on 5/23/2019 (TRG).
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley L. Wilson on behalf of Plaintiff ANTHONY OWENS. (Wilson, Bradley)
May 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay re #11 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint (judicial proceedings) and MOTION to Compel Arbitration , filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY OWENS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hartz, Eric)
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EMPLOYBRIDGE. (Litzinger, Emily)
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily N. Litzinger on behalf of Defendant EMPLOYBRIDGE. (Litzinger, Emily)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint (judicial proceedings) and, MOTION to Compel Arbitration, filed by Defendant EMPLOYBRIDGE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A - Arbitration Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Christina Powell, #4 Text of Proposed Order for Motion to Dismiss, #5 Text of Proposed Order for Motion to Stay Judicial Proceedings and Compel Arbitration)(Litzinger, Emily)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia Blevins Doll on behalf of Defendant EMPLOYBRIDGE. (Doll, Cynthia)
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC.. (Petrocelli, Kelly)
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Petrocelli on behalf of Defendant EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC.. (Petrocelli, Kelly)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by ANTHONY OWENS. EMPLOYBRIDGE served on 4/8/2019. (Haskin, John)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by ANTHONY OWENS. EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC. served on 4/9/2019. (Haskin, John)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to EMPLOYBRIDGE, EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC. (REO)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J Hartz on behalf of Plaintiff ANTHONY OWENS. (Hartz, Eric)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Haskin on behalf of Plaintiff ANTHONY OWENS. (Haskin, John)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by ANTHONY OWENS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5366136) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Haskin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OWENS v. EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMPLOYBRIDGE
Represented By: Cynthia Blevins Doll
Represented By: Emily N. Litzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPEDITORS INTERNATIONAL OF WASHINGTON, INC.
Represented By: Kelly A. Petrocelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMPLOYBRIDGE MIDWEST
Represented By: Cynthia Blevins Doll
Represented By: Emily N. Litzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY OWENS
Represented By: John H. Haskin
Represented By: Eric J Hartz
Represented By: Samuel Mark Adams
Represented By: Eric J. Hartz
Represented By: Bradley L. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?