KRUGER, III v. ARROW CONTAINER, LLC et al

Plaintiff: THOMAS KRUGER, III
Defendant: ARROW CONTAINER, LLC and JAMES LASARRE
Case Number: 1:2019cv01402
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 33 Witness List Preliminary, filed by Defendants ARROW CONTAINER, LLC, JAMES LASARRE, Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Defendants ARROW CONTAINER, LLC, JAMES LASARRE. (Oxyer, Alexandra)
July 2, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY in Support of Motion re #18 MOTION for Conditional Certification of Collective Action , filed by Plaintiff THOMAS KRUGER, III. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit C - Second Affidavit of Joseph Genrich)(Weldy, Ronald)
July 2, 2019 Filing 31 Witness List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff THOMAS KRUGER, III. (Weldy, Ronald)
July 2, 2019 Filing 30 Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff THOMAS KRUGER, III. (Weldy, Ronald)
June 25, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Conditional Certification of Collective Action , filed by Defendants ARROW CONTAINER, LLC, JAMES LASARRE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Emberton Declaration)(Oxyer, Alexandra)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/31/2019. (GD)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/30/2019. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended, to be entered by separate order. Conference concluded without further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/31/2019.(SWM)
May 29, 2019 Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants ARROW CONTAINER, LLC, JAMES LASARRE . (Oxyer, Alexandra)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION - Defendants Arrow Container, LLC and James LaSarre (the "Defendants"), by counsel, having moved this Court for a twenty-eight (28) day extension of time to June 25, 2019 within which to file their Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification, and the Court being duly advised in the premises and having considered the same, now grants said Motion. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Defendants shall have to and including June 25, 2019, within which to file a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 5/29/2019. (JDC)
May 24, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Stay Submission of Case Management Plan Pending Resolution of Conditional Certification, filed by Defendants ARROW CONTAINER, LLC, JAMES LASARRE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oxyer, Alexandra)
May 23, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to June 25, 2019 re #18 MOTION for Conditional Certification of Collective Action , filed by Defendants ARROW CONTAINER, LLC, JAMES LASARRE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oxyer, Alexandra)
May 16, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Overholt, Anthony)
May 14, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION for Conditional Certification of Collective Action , filed by Plaintiff THOMAS KRUGER, III. (Weldy, Ronald)
May 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Conditional Certification of Collective Action, filed by Plaintiff THOMAS KRUGER, III. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Thomas Kruger, #2 Affidavit Joseph Genrich, #3 Exhibit 1 - Genrich Paystubs)(Weldy, Ronald)
May 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants ARROW CONTAINER, LLC, JAMES LASARRE. (Oxyer, Alexandra)
April 29, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Arrow Container, LLC & James Lasarre on April 18, 2019, filed by THOMAS KRUGER, III. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service Affidavit)(Weldy, Ronald)
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra S. Oxyer on behalf of Defendants ARROW CONTAINER, LLC, JAMES LASARRE. (Oxyer, Alexandra)
April 23, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by THOMAS KRUGER, III.(Weldy, Ronald)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: On April 22, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Amended Complaint [Dkt. 10] attaching as an exhibit an Amended Complaint for Damages [Dkt. 10-1], pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B). However, Plaintiff must refile the amended complaint as a main document, not as an attachment to a notice. Accordingly, on or before April 26, 2019, Plaintiff shall refile the Amended Complaint for Damages in substantially the same form as was attached to Plaintiff's Notice. [Dkt. 10-1.] Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 4/23/2019.(SWM)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2019 04:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") on or before May 28, 2019. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 4/23/2019.(SWM)
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Consent of Class Representative, filed by Plaintiff THOMAS KRUGER, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent of Class Representative) (Weldy, Ronald) Modified on 4/23/2019 (BRR).
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff THOMAS KRUGER, III, re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint) (Weldy, Ronald)
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony W. Overholt on behalf of Defendants ARROW CONTAINER, LLC, JAMES LASARRE. (Overholt, Anthony)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to ARROW CONTAINER, LLC, JAMES LASARRE. (LAB) (JDC)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. 3)- Plaintiff seeks leave to proceed in forma pauperis. His motion is supported by an accompanying affidavit demonstrating the lack of financial ability to prepay the filing fee. Therefore, the motion to proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. #3 is granted. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. While in forma pauperis status allows the plaintiff to proceed without pre-payment of the filing fee, the plaintiff remains liable for the full fee. The filing fee for in forma pauperis litigants is $350. See USDC Fee Schedule at https://www.insd.uscourts.gov/fees-financial-information (stating that the $400 filing fee includes a $50 administrative fee, but that fee "does not apply to...persons granted in forma pauperis status under 28 U.S.C. 1915"). Immediate payment is not required, but the $350 balance remains owing. The clerk is directed to endorse and issue the summonses attached to the complaint and return them to Plaintiff's counsel. Counsel is responsible for serving process on the defendants consistent with Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, unless a specific request is made to the Court to effect service of process. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 4/12/2019. (JDC)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Consent of Class Representative, filed by Plaintiff THOMAS KRUGER, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent of Class Representative) (Weldy, Ronald)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff THOMAS KRUGER, III. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Forma Pauperis, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weldy, Ronald)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E. Weldy on behalf of Plaintiff THOMAS KRUGER, III. (Weldy, Ronald)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by THOMAS KRUGER, III. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Weldy, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KRUGER, III v. ARROW CONTAINER, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS KRUGER, III
Represented By: Ronald E. Weldy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARROW CONTAINER, LLC
Represented By: Anthony W. Overholt
Represented By: Alexandra S. Oxyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES LASARRE
Represented By: Anthony W. Overholt
Represented By: Alexandra S. Oxyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?