DRAKE v. MIRAND RESPONSE SYSTEMS, INC. et al

Plaintiff: BRENDA DRAKE
Defendant: MIRAND RESPONSE SYSTEMS, INC. and WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK
Case Number: 1:2019cv01458
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227b3
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #25 APPROVED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/27/2019.(SWM)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2020 at 02:00 PM in room #349, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Richard L. Young. Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 at 09:00 AM in room #349, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Richard L. Young. The court has allotted five days for this trial. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 6/27/2019.(JRB)
June 26, 2019 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated, filed by Defendants MIRAND RESPONSE SYSTEMS, INC., WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Watts, Patrick)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/7/2019.(SWM)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENTRY Discharging Show Cause: The court, having reviewed the return to the order to show cause, hereby determines that the show cause issued to defendant's counsel on June 3, 2019 (dkt. 20) for failure to appear for the May 28, 2019 initial pretrial conference, is DISCHARGED without sanction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/6/2019.(SWM)
June 5, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause, re #20 Pretrial Conference - InitialSet Hearings, filed by Defendants MIRAND RESPONSE SYSTEMS, INC., WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK. (Watts, Patrick)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 5/20/2020. Discovery due by 1/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/3/2019.(SWM)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Entry and Order to Show Cause - The plaintiff, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on May 28, 2019, with the magistrate judge. The defendant failed to appear. Within 7 days of this entry, counsel for the defendant is to show cause, in a filed writing, why he should not be sanctioned for failure to appear. This case is set for a telephone status conference on August 19, 2019, at10:00 a.m. (Eastern Time), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. *See Order for Details* Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (AKW)
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff BRENDA DRAKE . (Greenwald, Michael)
May 18, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK.(Watts, Patrick)
May 18, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by MIRAND RESPONSE SYSTEMS, INC..(Watts, Patrick)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2019 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/7/2019.(SWM)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying Defendants Mirand Response Systems, Inc. and Woodfrest National Bank's #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint. The motion was filed on the answer deadline and therefore does not comply with Local Rule 6-1(a)(5). Nevertheless, the court determines that the interest of justice counsels in favor of extending the deadline to avoid too harsh a consequence that could result from an outright denial. Defendants shall file and serve their answer or other response to the complaint on or before May 20, 2019. Counsel must take care to fully comply with all local rules in the future. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/7/2019. (SWM)
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 Submission of Proposed Order , re #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to May 20, 2019 to answer or otherwise plead, filed by Defendants MIRAND RESPONSE SYSTEMS, INC., WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK. (Watts, Patrick)
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK identifying Corporate Parent Woodforest Financial Group, Inc. for WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK.. (Watts, Patrick)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MIRAND RESPONSE SYSTEMS, INC.. (Watts, Patrick)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to May 20, 2019 to answer or otherwise plead, filed by Defendants MIRAND RESPONSE SYSTEMS, INC., WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK. (Watts, Patrick)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A. Watts on behalf of Defendants MIRAND RESPONSE SYSTEMS, INC., WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK. (Watts, Patrick)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Michael L. Greenwald hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Greenwald, Michael)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by BRENDA DRAKE. WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK served on 4/15/2019. (Klinger, Gary)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by BRENDA DRAKE. MIRAND RESPONSE SYSTEMS, INC. served on 4/15/2019. (Klinger, Gary)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary M. Klinger on behalf of Plaintiff BRENDA DRAKE. (Klinger, Gary)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Greenwald on behalf of Plaintiff BRENDA DRAKE. (Greenwald, Michael)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MIRAND RESPONSE SYSTEMS, INC., WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK. (JRB)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BRENDA DRAKE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5377435) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Greenwald, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DRAKE v. MIRAND RESPONSE SYSTEMS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIRAND RESPONSE SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Patrick A. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK
Represented By: Patrick A. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA DRAKE
Represented By: Michael L. Greenwald
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?