JLC-TECH LLC v. EDGE SYSTEMS GROUP LLC

Plaintiff: JLC-TECH, LLC and JLC-TECH LLC
Defendant: EDGE SYSTEMS GROUP, LLC and EDGE SYSTEMS GROUP LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01468
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service, filed by JLC-TECH LLC. JLC-TECH LLC served on 4/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Craig, Darren)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - March 2014 T-BAR LED (Linear Lighting) Brochure, #3 Exhibit 2 - VA-2-137-216 March 2014 T-BAR LED Brochure, #4 Exhibit 3 - October 2015 T-BAR LED (Linear Lighting) Brochure, #5 Exhibit 5 - 1800ledlight productwebpage, #6 Exhibit 6 - 1800ledlight productbrochure, #7 Exhibit 7 - 1800ledlight main page) (NAD)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 ALIAS Summons Issued as to EDGE SYSTEMS GROUP LLC. (NAD)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to EDGE SYSTEMS GROUP, LLC. (Craig, Darren) Modified on 4/17/2019 - Edited text to reflect issuance is to Defendant(NAD).
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to EDGE SYSTEMS GROUP LLC. (HET)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JLC-TECH, LLC. (Craig, Darren)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Darren Andrew Craig on behalf of Plaintiff JLC-TECH, LLC. (Craig, Darren)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against EDGE SYSTEMS GROUP, LLC, filed by JLC-TECH, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5378384) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - March 2014 T-BAR LED (Linear Lighting) Brochure, #2 Exhibit 2 - VA-2-137-216 March 2014 T-BAR LED Brochure, #3 Exhibit 3 - October 2015 T-BAR LED (Linear Lighting) Brochure, #4 Exhibit 4 - VA-2-137-165, #5 Exhibit 5 - 1800ledlight productwebpage, #6 Exhibit 6 - 1800ledlight productbrochure, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - 1800ledlight main page, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons)(Craig, Darren) Modified on 4/12/2019 (HET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JLC-TECH LLC v. EDGE SYSTEMS GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JLC-TECH, LLC
Represented By: Darren Andrew Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JLC-TECH LLC
Represented By: Darren Andrew Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDGE SYSTEMS GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDGE SYSTEMS GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?