DIXON et al v. NATIONAL HOT ROD ASSOCIATION
Plaintiff: CHAMPIONSHIP ADVENTURES, LLC,, LARRY DIXON and LARRY DIXON RACING, LLC
Defendant: NATIONAL HOT ROD ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01470
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1367
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - After considering Plaintiffs' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #18 , the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion as follows: The Court ORDERS that the Plaintiffs' deadline to file their response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Dkt. #16 is July 26, 2019. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 6/26/2019. (JDC)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to July 26, 2019 re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiffs CHAMPIONSHIP ADVENTURES, LLC,, LARRY DIXON, LARRY DIXON RACING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dassow, Robert)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION Requesting Oral Argument on Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, filed by Defendant NATIONAL HOT ROD ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mattingly, Jonathan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant NATIONAL HOT ROD ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2017 NHRA Rulebook, #2 Exhibit 4.19.2018 Panel Decision (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 7.2.2018 Amended Panel Decision (Redacted))(Mattingly, Jonathan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant NATIONAL HOT ROD ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mattingly, Jonathan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL HOT ROD ASSOCIATION. (Mattingly, Jonathan)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Paul K. Leary, Jr for NATIONAL HOT ROD ASSOCIATION added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Paul K. Leary, Jr. register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by May 17, 2019. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to Paul K. Leary via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/3/2019. (SWM)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney David Reichenberg for NATIONAL HOT ROD ASSOCIATION added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that David Reichenberg register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by May 17, 2019. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to David Reichenberg via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/3/2019. (SWM)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Thomas M. O'Rourke for NATIONAL HOT ROD ASSOCIATION added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Thomas M. O'Rourke register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by May 17, 2019. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to Thomas M. O'Rourke via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/3/2019. (SWM) Modified on 5/6/2019 (SWM).
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul K. Leary, Jr. to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5411586), filed by Defendant NATIONAL HOT ROD ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Paul K Leary, Jr., #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mattingly, Jonathan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) David Reichenberg to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5411559), filed by Defendant NATIONAL HOT ROD ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of David Reichenberg, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mattingly, Jonathan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas M. O'Rourke to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5411474), filed by Defendant NATIONAL HOT ROD ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Thomas M. O'Rourke, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mattingly, Jonathan)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by LARRY DIXON, CHAMPIONSHIP ADVENTURES, LLC,, LARRY DIXON RACING, LLC. NATIONAL HOT ROD ASSOCIATION waiver sent on 4/22/2019. (Dassow, Robert)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D. Mattingly on behalf of Defendant NATIONAL HOT ROD ASSOCIATION. (Mattingly, Jonathan)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL HOT ROD ASSOCIATION. (HET)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Thomas Dassow on behalf of Plaintiffs CHAMPIONSHIP ADVENTURES, LLC,, LARRY DIXON, LARRY DIXON RACING, LLC. (Dassow, Robert)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5379379) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Dassow, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIXON et al v. NATIONAL HOT ROD ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL HOT ROD ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jonathan D. Mattingly
Represented By: Paul K. Leary, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas M. O'Rourke
Represented By: David Reichenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAMPIONSHIP ADVENTURES, LLC,
Represented By: Robert Thomas Dassow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY DIXON
Represented By: Robert Thomas Dassow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY DIXON RACING, LLC
Represented By: Robert Thomas Dassow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?