BELL v. MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.

Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Defendant: MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC. and MARRIOTT, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01505
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Richard N. Bell hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Bell, Richard)
July 4, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Bell, Richard)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Defendant MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.. (Clayton, Brett)
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Maura K. Kennedy on behalf of Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Kennedy, Maura)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/18/2019.(CBU)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Discovery due by 2/3/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/2/2020. Settlement Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 8:30 AM in room #255, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/18/2019.(CBU)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by counsel for an Initial Pretrial Conference on June 12, 2019. The Court will approve the Case Management Plan, by separate order, with the changes to which the parties have agreed. This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on September 18, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. (Eastern) to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. In addition, this matter is scheduled for a settlement conference on November 13, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. (Eastern), in Room 255, United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana, before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL . (Bell, Richard)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint , filed by MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC..(Clayton, Brett)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2019 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/13/2019.(SWM)
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Parties' First Extension to Plead in Response to Complaint, filed by Defendant MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clayton, Brett) Modified on 5/9/2019 (JDH).
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett T. Clayton on behalf of Defendant MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.. (Clayton, Brett)
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC. served on 4/23/2019. (Bell, Richard)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. Copy mailed to Register of Copyrights via U.S. mail. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A- Copyrighted Indianapolis Photo, #3 Exhibit B - Screenshot of Infringement, #4 Amended Complaint) (JDH)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC. (JDH)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC., filed by RICHARD N. BELL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Copyrighted Indianapolis Photo, #2 Exhibit B-Screen Shot of Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Bell, Richard)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MARRIOTT, LLC. (DJH)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to MARRIOTT, LLC. (Bell, Richard)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard N. Bell on behalf of Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Bell, Richard)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARRIOTT, LLC, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5384484) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Copyrighted Indianapolis Photo, #2 Exhibit B-Screen Shot of Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Bell, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELL v. MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Represented By: Richard N. Bell
Represented By: Maura K. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Brett T. Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARRIOTT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?