GARRETT et al v. AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.

Plaintiff: LAWRENCE MAXEY and ANTWANN GARRETT
Defendant: AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01509
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 7/15/2019 re #27 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #32 MOTION to Strike #23 NOTICE of Filing #24 NOTICE of Filing and #30 MOTION to Partially Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/5/2019. (CBU)
July 3, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendant AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ridolfo, Anthony)
June 28, 2019 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to July 15, 2019 re #30 MOTION to Partially Stay Discovery, #27 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #32 MOTION to Strike #23 NOTICE of Filing, #24 NOTICE of Filing , filed by Plaintiffs ANTWANN GARRETT, LAWRENCE MAXEY, Counter Defendants ANTWANN GARRETT, LAWRENCE MAXEY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNeil, Andrew)
June 25, 2019 Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiffs ANTWANN GARRETT, LAWRENCE MAXEY . (McNeil, Andrew)
June 24, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Strike #23 NOTICE of Filing, #24 NOTICE of Filing , filed by Defendant AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ridolfo, Anthony)
June 24, 2019 Filing 31 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #30 MOTION to Partially Stay Discovery , filed by Defendant AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Ridolfo, Anthony)
June 24, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Partially Stay Discovery, filed by Defendant AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ridolfo, Anthony)
June 24, 2019 Filing 29 Designation of Evidence re #27 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Ridolfo, Anthony)
June 24, 2019 Filing 28 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Ridolfo, Anthony)
June 24, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Ridolfo, Anthony)
June 24, 2019 Filing 26 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Ridolfo, Anthony)
June 24, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ridolfo, Anthony)
June 11, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff in a Collective Action under the Fair Labor Standards Act by Harold W. Jeffries by ANTWANN GARRETT, LAWRENCE MAXEY (McNeil, Andrew)
June 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff in a Collective Action Under the Fair Labor Standards Act by Matthew E. Cook by ANTWANN GARRETT, LAWRENCE MAXEY (McNeil, Andrew)
June 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS, filed by Defendant AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC. (Ridolfo, Anthony)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Defendant's #17 Motion for Continuance. Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 7/9/2019 09:30 AM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. All instructions in this Court's May 13, 2019, Scheduling Order (ECF No. #14 ) remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/10/2019.(SWM)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC., filed by ANTWANN GARRETT and LAWRENCE MAXEY.(SWM)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #16 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Within 7 days Defendant shall file either a motion to withdraw the motion to dismiss [Filing No. 12] or a notice that the motion to dismiss still needs to be addressed by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/10/2019. (SWM)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 MARGINAL ENTRY - Acknowledges Defendant's Counterclaim in hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 6/7/2019. (CKM)
June 4, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Continuance , filed by Defendant AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ridolfo, Anthony)
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs ANTWANN GARRETT, LAWRENCE MAXEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Individual, Class Action, and FLSA Collective Action Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McNeil, Andrew)
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Defendant AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC., Counter Claimant AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Ridolfo, Anthony)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2019 10:30 AM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 5/13/2019.(SWM)
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant's Counterclaim) , filed by Plaintiffs ANTWANN GARRETT, LAWRENCE MAXEY, Counter Defendants ANTWANN GARRETT, LAWRENCE MAXEY. (McNeil, Andrew)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant's Counterclaim), filed by Plaintiffs ANTWANN GARRETT, LAWRENCE MAXEY, Counter Defendants ANTWANN GARRETT, LAWRENCE MAXEY. (McNeil, Andrew)
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 Submission of State Court Record from Marion County in case number 49D05-1903-PL-012343. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(HET)
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal by AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, Docket Sheet, Complaint, Appearance, Summons, Affidavit of Service, Appearance, Appearance, Appearance, Notice of Filing of Petition fo Removal, Exhibit 1)(Ridolfo, Anthony)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Ridolfo, Anthony)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Bodle on behalf of Defendant AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Bodle, David)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven T. Henke on behalf of Defendant AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Henke, Steven)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs, filed by AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC..(Ridolfo, Anthony)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Seaton Ridolfo, Jr on behalf of Defendant AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Ridolfo, Anthony)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Seaton Ridolfo, Jr on behalf of Defendant AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Ridolfo, Anthony)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Seaton Ridolfo, Jr on behalf of Defendant AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Ridolfo, Anthony)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Civil Court 1, case number 49D01-1902-PL-006428, filed by AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5385002) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Ridolfo, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARRETT et al v. AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQUATIC RENOVATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Anthony Seaton Ridolfo, Jr.
Represented By: Steven T. Henke
Represented By: David J. Bodle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE MAXEY
Represented By: Tyler John Moorhead
Represented By: Andrew M. McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTWANN GARRETT
Represented By: Tyler John Moorhead
Represented By: Andrew M. McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?